SmartPhone Technologies LLC v. Research In Motion Corporation et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: SmartPhone Technologies LLC
Defendant: Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co. LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo Electronic Device (U.S.A.), Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Apple, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Insight Enterprises, Inc., AT&T Inc. and AT&T Mobility LLC
Case Number: 6:2010cv00074
Filed: March 3, 2010
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Tyler Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2010 1
COMPLAINT against LG Electronics USA, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Apple, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Insight Enterprises, Inc., AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co. LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo Electronic Device (U.S.A.), Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002382186.), filed by SmartPhone Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Thomas)
January 17, 2012 352 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER adopting the constructions set forth in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/17/12. cc:attys 1-17-12(mll, )
February 13, 2012 366 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER adopting the constructions set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/13/12. cc:attys 2-14-12(mll, )
August 2, 2012 402 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re Claim Construction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/2/2012. (leh, )
March 1, 2013 647 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 629 SEALED MOTION Apple Inc.'s REBUTTAL MOTION for Immediate Compliance with SmartPhone's Discovery Obligations AND Apple Inc.'s OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Clarificati on of Order on Motion to Compel filed by Apple, Inc., and denying 624 Opposed MOTION Emergency Motion for Clarification of Order on Motion to Compel re 604 Order on Sealed Patent Motion filed by SmartPhone Technologies LLC. In addition, Smart Phone is ordered to pay Apple's reasonable expenses and attorneys' fees incurred in association with Apple's original Motion to Compel SmartPhone to Produce Documents in Accordance with its Discovery Obligations 462 and Apple's Motion for Compliance 629 , pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a) and (b). Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/1/13. (mjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SmartPhone Technologies LLC v. Research In Motion Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SmartPhone Technologies LLC
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research In Motion Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research in Motion Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co. LTD.,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Telecommunications America LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Electronic Device (U.S.A.), Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pantech Wireless, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Enterprises, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]