WI-LAN Inc. v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Counter_defendant: WI-LAN Inc.
Counter_claimant: Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: WI-LAN Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
 
Case Number: 6:2012cv00920
Filed: December 6, 2012
 
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2014 Case Stayed per 50 Order. (mll, )
January 30, 2014 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 49 Motion to Amend/Correct Deadlines. All deadlines in this case are STAYED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/30/14. (mll, )
January 17, 2014 49 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Deadlines by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
November 27, 2013 48 Markman Hearing set for 11/6/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Selection set for 3/7/2016 at 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 3/14/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/27/2013. (gsg)
October 7, 2013 47 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/07/13. (mll, )
September 23, 2013 46 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Apple Inc., WI-LAN Inc.. (Scarsi, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
September 23, 2013 45 Featured Case ORDER denying 21 Motion to Change Venue; denying 27 Supplemental Motion to Change Venue; denying as moot 22 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/23/13. (mll, )
August 9, 2013 44 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by WI-LAN Inc. [Damages Statement] (Weaver, David)
July 30, 2013 43 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc. (Lin, Ashlee)
July 30, 2013 42 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by WI-LAN Inc. (Weaver, David)
June 28, 2013 41 Featured Case ORDER RE DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/28/13. (mll, )
June 26, 2013 40 NOTICE by Apple Inc., WI-LAN Inc. re AGREEMENT AS TO ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information)(Weaver, David)
June 25, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Mediator. Robert Faulkner is appointed as Mediator in this cause. (mll, )
June 25, 2013 39 Featured Case DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 3/11/2014. Robert Faulkner is appointed as Mediator in this cause. Jury Selection set for 11/2/2015 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 5/15/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/25/13. (mll, )
June 25, 2013 38 Featured Case AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/25/13. (mll, )
June 25, 2013 37 Featured Case AGREED DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/25/13. (mll, )
June 24, 2013 36 NOTICE by Apple Inc., WI-LAN Inc. of Dispute as to Order Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Disputed Order)(Weaver, David)
June 24, 2013 35 NOTICE by Apple Inc., WI-LAN Inc. of Agreement as to Docket Control Order, Discovery Order and Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreed Docket Control Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Agreed Discovery Order, # 3 Exhibit C - Agreed Protective Order)(Weaver, David)
May 16, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER setting Status Conference for 6/27/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/16/13. (mll, )
March 28, 2013 33 NOTICE by WI-LAN Inc. Plaintiff's Notice That Case is Ready for Scheduling Conference (Weaver, David)
March 28, 2013 32 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Weaver, David)
February 25, 2013 31 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 22 Opposed MOTION to Stay filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Weaver, David)
February 25, 2013 30 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 21 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Weaver, David)
February 14, 2013 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re 22 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfere Venue filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
February 14, 2013 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re 27 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue (SUPPLEMENTAL), 21 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Khanna Declaration)(Smith, Melissa)
February 13, 2013 27 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue (SUPPLEMENTAL) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Mark Buckley, # 2 Exhibit A to Buckley Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 11, 2013 26 Wi-LAN Inc.'s REPLY/ ANSWER to 20 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by WI-LAN Inc..(Weaver, David)
February 4, 2013 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re 22 Opposed MOTION to Stay filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Syed Fareed ISO Wi-LAN Opposition to Apple's Motion to Stay, # 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Syed Fareed, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2013: # 4 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
February 4, 2013 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Syed Fareed ISO Wi-LAN's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue, # 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Syed Fareed, # 3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Syed Fareed, # 4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Syed Fareed, # 5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Syed Fareed, # 6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Syed Fareed, # 7 Exhibit F - Declaration of Syed Fareed, # 8 Exhibit G - Declaration of Syed Fareed, # 9 Exhibit H - Declaration of Syed Fareed, # 10 Exhibit I - Declaration of Syed Fareed, # 11 Exhibit J - Declaration of Syed Fareed, # 12 Exhibit K - Declaration of Syed Fareed, # 13 Exhibit L - Declaration of Syed Fareed, # 14 Exhibit M - Declaration of Syed Fareed, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2013: # 16 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
January 16, 2013 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
January 16, 2013 22 Opposed MOTION to Stay by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 16, 2013 21 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit SMITH Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to Smith Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 16, 2013 20 APPLE INC.'S ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against WI-LAN Inc. by Apple Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
January 16, 2013 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ashlee Lin on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3957361. (Lin, Ashlee)
January 16, 2013 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Miguel Ruiz on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3957357. (Ruiz, Miguel)
January 16, 2013 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Miremadi on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3957349. (Miremadi, Jennifer)
January 16, 2013 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark C Scarsi on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3957331. (Scarsi, Mark)
January 7, 2013 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven R Borgman on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Borgman, Steven)
January 7, 2013 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Syed Kamil Fareed on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Fareed, Syed)
January 7, 2013 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Adam Lindner on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Lindner, Seth)
January 7, 2013 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey T Han on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Han, Jeffrey)
January 7, 2013 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Janice Le Ta on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Ta, Janice)
January 7, 2013 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chuck Patrick Ebertin on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Ebertin, Chuck)
January 7, 2013 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Avelyn Marie Ross on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Ross, Avelyn)
January 7, 2013 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ajeet P Pai on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Pai, Ajeet)
January 7, 2013 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WI-LAN Inc. (Weaver, David)
January 7, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 5 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 1/16/2013. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension. (Filed by pltf on behalf of deft)( mll, )
January 3, 2013 6 Return of Service Executed as to Apple Inc. on 12/12/2012, by personal service; answer due: 1/2/2013. (mll, )
January 2, 2013 5 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc.( Weaver, David)
December 21, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 4, Return of Service. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (gsg)
December 17, 2012 4 ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by WI-LAN Inc. re 3 Summons Issued upon Apple Inc. and Proof of Service of SUMMONS (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es) Proof of Service by MAIL)(Weaver, David) Modified on 12/21/2012 (gsg).
December 12, 2012 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb)
December 12, 2012 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Hill, Jack)
December 6, 2012 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
December 6, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3904331.), filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - USP 6,381,211, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weaver, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: WI-LAN Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: WI-LAN Inc.
Represented By: Steven R Borgman
Represented By: Chuck Patrick Ebertin
Represented By: Syed Kamil Fareed
Represented By: Jeffrey T Han
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Seth Adam Lindner
Represented By: Ajeet P Pai
Represented By: Avelyn Marie Ross
Represented By: Janice Le Ta
Represented By: David B Weaver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WI-LAN Inc.
Represented By: Steven R Borgman
Represented By: Chuck Patrick Ebertin
Represented By: Syed Kamil Fareed
Represented By: Jeffrey T Han
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Seth Adam Lindner
Represented By: Ajeet P Pai
Represented By: Avelyn Marie Ross
Represented By: Janice Le Ta
Represented By: David B Weaver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Ashlee Lin
Represented By: Jennifer Miremadi
Represented By: Miguel Ruiz
Represented By: Mark C Scarsi
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]