Lopez et al v. Pena et al

Plaintiff: James Foxe and Rolando Cruz Lopez
Defendant: Alejandro Pena, United States Customs and Border Protection and United States Department of Homeland Security
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00165
Filed: August 7, 2012
 
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Amarillo Office
County: Randall
Presiding Judge: Mary Lou Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:3410
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2012 30 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS: re: 15 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. the United States is dismissed as a party. (Ordered by Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 12/12/2012) (egb)
March 5, 2013 37 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Pena's 31 Motion to Dismiss on limitations grounds is denied. On qualified immunity, Pena's motion is granted subject to Cruz Lopez filing his amended complaint, with factual detail and particularity suppo rt his Section 2701(a) and/or Section 2703 claims against Pena, within 21 days of this order. If Cruz Lopez fails to so file, dismissal of Count II will become final, with prejudice and Pena will be dismissed as a party. This order does not and is not to be construed to prevent Pena from urging qualified immunity as a defense to any amended complaint. (Ordered by Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 3/5/2013) (plh)
May 22, 2013 46 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Pena's motion to dismiss the Section 2701 claim is granted with prejudice. Pena's motion to dismiss the Section 2703 claim is denied. (Ordered by Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 5/22/2013) (plh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lopez et al v. Pena et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Foxe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Cruz Lopez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Pena
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]