Pyramid Transportation Inc et al v. Greatwide Dallas Mavis LLC

Defendant: Greatwide Dallas Mavis LLC
Counter_claimant: Greatwide Dallas Mavis LLC
Counter_defendant: Pyramid Transportation Inc
Plaintiff: Pyramid Transportation Inc and Claudio Macias
Case Number: 3:2012cv00149
Filed: January 17, 2012
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Dallas Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2012 154 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 70 MOTION for Leave to Reply Appendix to Defendant's Response to Partial Summary Judgment and granting 72 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/21/2012) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
March 7, 2013 176 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 53 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Pyramid Transportation Inc.; denying 57 Motion to Sever filed by Pyramid Transportation Inc.; granting 125 Motion for Leave to File, filed by Pyramid Tra nsportation Inc.; denying in part 128 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Greatwide Dallas Mavis LLC; raising sua sponte that Greatwide Dallas Mavis LLC is entitled to summary judgment dismissing the Carmack Amendment claim of Pyramid Transport ation Inc. based on lack of prudential standing and directing that Pyramid Transportation Inc. respond within 21 days of the date this memorandum opinion and order is filed. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/7/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
July 25, 2013 202 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER dismissing Carmack Amendment claim of plaintiff Pyramid Transportation, Inc.; granting 30 days for real party in interest to ratify, join, or substitute into this action; and granting 185 defendant's Expedited MOTION for Leave to File Appendix in Support of Reply (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/25/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pyramid Transportation Inc et al v. Greatwide Dallas Mavis LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greatwide Dallas Mavis LLC
Represented By: John W Greene
Represented By: Rebecca E Heinemann
Represented By: Daniel P Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Greatwide Dallas Mavis LLC
Represented By: John W Greene
Represented By: Rebecca E Heinemann
Represented By: Daniel P Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Pyramid Transportation Inc
Represented By: KC Ashmore
Represented By: Henry Peyton Inge, IV
Represented By: Ryan Wozny
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pyramid Transportation Inc
Represented By: Ryan Wozny
Represented By: Henry Peyton Inge, IV
Represented By: KC Ashmore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudio Macias
Represented By: Henry Peyton Inge, IV
Represented By: KC Ashmore
Represented By: Ryan Wozny
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]