Lee et al v. Verizon Communications Inc et al

Plaintiff: William Lee and Joanne McPartlin
Defendant: Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc, Verizon Employee Benefits Committee, Verizon Investment Management Corp and Verizon Management Pension Plan
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv04834
Filed: November 27, 2012
 
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Dallas Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 6 Motion for TRO filed by William Lee, Joanne McPartlin and denying 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by William Lee, Joanne McPartlin. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/7/2012) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
June 24, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 64 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Verizon Employee Benefits Committee, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc, Verizon Investment Management Corp, Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Management Pension Plan; denying without prejudice as moot 71 Motion to Amend filed by Joanne McPartlin, Edward Pundt, William Lee. Plaintiffs are granted 30 days from the date of the memorandum opinion and order to file a second amended complaint. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/24/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
April 11, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 79 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Verizon Employee Benefits Committee, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc, Verizon Investment Management Corp, Verizon Communications Inc, and Verizon Management Pension Plan. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/11/2014) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lee et al v. Verizon Communications Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lee
Represented By: Curtis L Kennedy
Represented By: Robert E Goodman, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne McPartlin
Represented By: Curtis L Kennedy
Represented By: Robert E Goodman, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications Inc
Represented By: Joanne R Bush
Represented By: Thomas Leon Cubbage, III
Represented By: Jeffrey G Huvelle
Represented By: Matthew D Orwig
Represented By: Christian J Pistilli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc
Represented By: Joanne R Bush
Represented By: Thomas Leon Cubbage, III
Represented By: Jeffrey G Huvelle
Represented By: Matthew D Orwig
Represented By: Christian J Pistilli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Employee Benefits Committee
Represented By: Joanne R Bush
Represented By: Thomas Leon Cubbage, III
Represented By: Jeffrey G Huvelle
Represented By: Matthew D Orwig
Represented By: Christian J Pistilli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Investment Management Corp
Represented By: Joanne R Bush
Represented By: Thomas Leon Cubbage, III
Represented By: Jeffrey G Huvelle
Represented By: Matthew D Orwig
Represented By: Christian J Pistilli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Management Pension Plan
Represented By: Joanne R Bush
Represented By: Thomas Leon Cubbage, III
Represented By: Jeffrey G Huvelle
Represented By: Matthew D Orwig
Represented By: Christian J Pistilli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]