Olaoye v. Wells Fargo Bank NA

Plaintiff: Kolade Olaoye
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 3:2012cv04873
Filed: November 30, 2012
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Dallas Office
County: Tarrant
Presiding Judge: Barbara M.G. Lynn
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Accepting 8 Findings and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge: Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA's 5 Motion to Transfer filed 12/20/2012, is DENIED, and its alternative Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim is GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 9/27/2013) (axm)
December 30, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order Denying 13 Motion for Protective Order Under Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (see order) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 12/30/2013) (mcrd)
March 17, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/17/2014) (skt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olaoye v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kolade Olaoye
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Matthew K Hansen
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Jason L Sanders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]