Moore v. Westbrook Featured Case

Plaintiff: Christopher Moore
Defendant: James Westbrook
Movant: Craig Watkins
Case Number: 3:2013cv01466
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Dallas Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ndt)
June 25, 2013 8 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Christopher Moore. (Pikl, James)
May 9, 2013 7 Featured Case ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant must file his answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint no later than June 14, 2013. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/9/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
May 9, 2013 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Other Responsive Pleading To Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Craig Watkins. Party Craig Watkins added. (Harlan, Peter)
May 2, 2013 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to James Westbrook ; served on 4/23/2013. (Pikl, James)
April 15, 2013 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Christopher Moore. (axm)
April 15, 2013 3 Summons Issued as to James Westbrook. (axm)
April 15, 2013 2 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against James Westbrook filed by Christopher Moore. (Filing fee $350; Receipt number 65826) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership (axm)
April 15, 2013 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Fitzwater. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Moore
Represented By: James A Pikl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Craig Watkins
Represented By: Peter L Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]