Oldendorff Carriers GmbH & Co. KG v. Grand China Shipping (Hong Kong) Co Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Oldendorff Carriers GmbH & Co. KG
Defendant: Grand China Shipping (Hong Kong) Co Ltd, Grand China Logistics Holding (Group) Company Limited, Offshore Heavy Transport AS and OHT Eagle AS
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00074
Filed: March 7, 2012
 
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: XX Outside US
Referring Judge: Brian L Owsley
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DISCOVERY Plaintiff's Amended Complaint due by 12/15/2012. Defendants may amend their motion to dismiss and/or submit additional evidence by 12/31/2012. Plaintiff may amend its response to the motion to dismiss and/or submit additional evidence by 1/21/2013.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(amireles, )
July 30, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: granting 56 Sealed Event, adopting 63 Memorandum and Recommendations (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, )
September 26, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 75 Bill of Costs. Court ORDERS that the bond premiums in the amount of $95,464.00 be stricken from the Defendants' Bill of Costs. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Oldendorff Carriers GmbH & Co. KG v. Grand China Shipping (Hong Kong) Co Ltd et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oldendorff Carriers GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By: Dabney Welsh Pettus
Represented By: George M Chalos
Represented By: Briton P Sparkman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand China Shipping (Hong Kong) Co Ltd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand China Logistics Holding (Group) Company Limited
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Heavy Transport AS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OHT Eagle AS
Represented By: Richard Anthony Branca
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]