WHITE ROSEBAY SHIPPING S.A., v. HNA GROUP CO. LTD. et al

Plaintiff: WHITE ROSEBAY SHIPPING S.A.,
Defendant: HNA GROUP CO. LTD., HONG KONG CHAIN GLORY LTD., GRAND CHINA SHIPPING DEVELOPMENT CO., Offshore Heavy Transport AS and OHT OSPREY AS
Case Number: 2:2012cv00096
Filed: March 28, 2012
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Anderson
Referring Judge: Brian L Owsley
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion granting Plaintiff's Motion to Unseal Documents and Denying Defendants Motion to Strike re 57 Motion to Unseal; denying as moot 61 Motion to Strike.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian L Owsley) Parties notified.(amireles, )
February 5, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion to Vacate; denying 31 Motion to Dismiss; denying 31 Motion to Vacate.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(amireles, )
February 25, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER denying 70 Motion for Entry of Order.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian L Owsley) Parties notified.(mserpa, )
March 29, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 4 Motion for the Issuance of Process of Writ Maritime Attachment and Garnishment.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian L Owsley) Parties notified.(sscotch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITE ROSEBAY SHIPPING S.A., v. HNA GROUP CO. LTD. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHITE ROSEBAY SHIPPING S.A.,
Represented By: William Sean O'Neil
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HNA GROUP CO. LTD.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONG KONG CHAIN GLORY LTD.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAND CHINA SHIPPING DEVELOPMENT CO.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Heavy Transport AS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OHT OSPREY AS
Represented By: Ralph F Meyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]