Louangel, Inc. et al v. Darden Restaurants, Inc. et al

Defendant: RARE Hospitality Management, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc. and Darden Concepts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Louangel, Inc. and The Longhorn Boys Corporation
Case Number: 2:2012cv00147
Filed: May 11, 2012
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Nueces
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2013 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TACKING re 93 .(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(amireles, )
June 5, 2013 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 103 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 132 Motion to Strike.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(sscotch, )
November 26, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Compel.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, )
November 30, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion to Quash.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louangel, Inc. et al v. Darden Restaurants, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RARE Hospitality Management, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary Thomas Mayer
Represented By: Cynthia R Parks
Represented By: Jackquelyn M Strickland
Represented By: Anne E Yates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Jackquelyn M Strickland
Represented By: Cynthia R Parks
Represented By: Zachary Thomas Mayer
Represented By: Anne E Yates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darden Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary Thomas Mayer
Represented By: Cynthia R Parks
Represented By: Jackquelyn M Strickland
Represented By: Anne E Yates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louangel, Inc.
Represented By: Ted Dalton Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Longhorn Boys Corporation
Represented By: Ted Dalton Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]