Kish v. Rogers, et al

 
Case Number: 4:2006cv02389
Filed: July 18, 2006
 
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
 
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2008 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered GRANTING Defts. 96 MOTION for Appointment of Receiver, DENYING Pltfs. 86 MOTION. Docket call remains set for 6/27/08, at 2:00 p.m. to address remaining issues.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
July 1, 2008 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered APPOINTING RANDY WILLIAMS AS RECEIVER. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal). Parties notified.(leddins, )
November 18, 2008 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONFIRMING SALE entered GRANTING USA's 115 MOTION for Order of Sale.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
November 18, 2008 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR SALE AND TRANSFER OF STOCK entered : GRANTING USA's 116 MOTION for Order of Sale.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
December 11, 2008 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered GRANTING 123 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
December 12, 2008 127 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered DENYING 120 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
April 21, 2009 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS entered: OVERRULING 129 MOTION Resolve Unresolved Issues, GRANTING Govts. 132 MOTION for Final Judgment. Final judgment will be entered by separate order.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
April 21, 2009 135 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT entered in favor of the Government. Costs of court are taxed to Joseph Kish. Case terminated on 4/21/09.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
July 10, 2009 136 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of United States against Joseph Michael Kish.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(pwilliams, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kish v. Rogers, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]