Fryar v. Viacom, Inc. et al. Featured Case

Defendant: Google, Inc. and Viacom, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephanie Fryar
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv03713
Filed: December 21, 2012
 
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Melinda Harmon
 
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER granting 5 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Outcome of MDL Motion, Deadlines terminated(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, )
January 30, 2013 5 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Outcome of MDL Motion by Stephanie Fryar, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Voyles, Adam)
January 8, 2013 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Stephanie Fryar, filed.(Voyles, Adam)
January 2, 2013 3 AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Plaintiffs filed by Stephanie Fryar.(Voyles, Adam)
December 24, 2012 Summons Issued as to Viacom, Inc., filed. (wbostic)
December 24, 2012 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc., filed. (wbostic)
December 24, 2012 2 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/10/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified. (wbostic)
December 21, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Stephanie Fryar (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0541-10769161) filed by Stephanie Fryar. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons- Viacom Inc., # 3 Summons-Google Inc.)(Voyles, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fryar v. Viacom, Inc. et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Fryar
Represented By: Adam Q Voyles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]