Keough v. ExpressJet Airlines, Inc.

Defendant: Air Line Pilots Association International and ExpressJet Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Timothy John Keough
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01343
Filed: May 8, 2013
 
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 American Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2014 108 Featured Case ORDER entered setting a hearing: Miscellaneous Hearing set for 8/1/2014 at 08:30 AM at Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
June 30, 2014 109 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered based on settlement notification. Case terminated on 6/30/14.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
June 4, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER entered GRANTING 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer ( Answer due by 7/6/2013 ).(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
June 6, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER entered GRANTING 20 ExpressJet's MOTION for Extension of Time Answer and/or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. Answer due by 7/8/2013. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
July 8, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER entered GRANTING 32 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer and/or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. Answer due by 8/5/2013. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
December 10, 2013 64 Featured Case ORDER entered GRANTING 59 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Answers of ExpressJet, DENYING 50 MOTION to Strike 45 Answer to Complaint . (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
May 29, 2014 93 Featured Case ORDER entered: On May 15, 2014, a telephone conference was held in which the court set the date for the defendants to take the plaintiff's deposition. The court clarifies that this deposition is set for July 14, 2014, with July 15, 2014 set as an alternative date. The minute entry will be changed to reflect these dates. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Keough v. ExpressJet Airlines, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Line Pilots Association International
Represented By: Patrick M Flynn
Represented By: Suzanne L Kalfus
Represented By: John E Wells
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExpressJet Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Buena Vista Lyons
Represented By: Sarah P. Wimberly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy John Keough
Represented By: Nancy W Keough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]