Berry v. Kior, Inc. et al

Defendant: John K. Karnes, Fred Cannon and Kior, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Berry
Case Number: 4:2013cv02443
Filed: August 20, 2013
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered GRANTING the Plaintiff's motion for leave to file second amended complaint and modify the scheudling order. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
September 19, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered GRANTING 68 Joint MOTION Joint Request to Postpone Hearing Scheduled for September 26, 2014. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
November 14, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered: Defendant KiOR, Inc. filed a petition in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware as Case No. 14-12514 on November 9, 2014. A petition filed under 11 U.S.C. §§ 301, et seq., operates as a stay of a ju dicial proceeding against the debtor that was commenced before the bankruptcy proceeding. 11 U.S.C. § 362(a)(1). The claims against KiOR are stayed. The plaintiff may reinstate these claims to the active docket on notice to this court of the discontinuance of the stay under 11 U.S.C. § 362(c)(2), provided the notice is filed within 14 days after the bankruptcy stay is discontinued. No later than November 24, 2014, the parties must file a statement explaining the impact of the stay on the claims against the individual defendants. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Kior, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John K. Karnes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Cannon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kior, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Berry
Represented By: Sammy Ford, IV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]