Avila et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Luis L. Avila and Mayra V. Avila |
Defendant: |
U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement dated as of August 1, 2006, GSAMP Trust 2006-HE5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE5, Southstar Funding, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Litton Loan Servicing, LP |
Case Number: |
5:2014cv00807 |
Filed: |
September 12, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Texas |
Office: |
San Antonio Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Xavier Rodriguez |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 2, 2014 |
Filing
9
ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Plaintiff's petition is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to enter final judgment, and close this case. Defendant's awarded costs of court and shall file a Bill of Costs pursuant to Local Rules. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
|
November 6, 2014 |
Filing
8
ORDER re 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Litton Loan Servicing, LP, U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement dated as of August 1, 2006, GSAMP Trust 2006-HE5, Mo rtgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE5, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.; The Avilas shall have till NOvember 20, 2014 to file their eveidence and response to the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Avila et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement dated as of August 1, 2006, GSAMP Trust 2006-HE5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE5 |
Represented By: |
Jessica Alison Hinkie |
Represented By: |
Kari Robinson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Southstar Funding, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC |
Represented By: |
Jessica Alison Hinkie |
Represented By: |
Kari Robinson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Jessica Alison Hinkie |
Represented By: |
Kari Robinson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Litton Loan Servicing, LP |
Represented By: |
Kari Robinson |
Represented By: |
Jessica Alison Hinkie |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Luis L. Avila |
Represented By: |
Claudia Arrieta Smith |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Mayra V. Avila |
Represented By: |
Claudia Arrieta Smith |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?