Robertson v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Michael B Robertson
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00623
Filed: July 7, 2010
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
 
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2012 24 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Commissioner's decision is REVERSED AND REMANDED for further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 7/26/12. (alp)
December 13, 2012 33 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 28 Motion for Attorney Fees. Within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, the Commissioner shall pay Plaintiff an EAJA attorney fee award of $7500.00, but that award shall be payable directly to Plaintiff, not to his counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/13/2012. (asp)
January 10, 2013 36 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 35 Motion to Amend/Correct 33 Memorandum Decision. The Commissioner shall pay Plaintiff an EAJA attorney fee award of $7500.00,but that award shall be payable directly to Plaintiff, not to his counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 01/10/2013. (asp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Robertson v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B Robertson
Represented By: John J. Borsos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]