Hutt v. Hofmann et al

Plaintiff: Robert Hutt
Defendant: Robert Hofmann, Paul . Brosseau, James Seavey, Joshua Rutherford, Stanley Wood, Jeffrey Schmeltz, Brian Kearns, Scott Isenor and Geoffrey Fronberg
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv00202
Filed: October 2, 2008
 
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William K. Sessions III
Referring Judge: Jerome J. Niedermeier
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2009 27 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - recommending that defendants' 16 MOTION to Dismiss be granted in part and denied in part. All claims for damages against defendants in their official capacities should be dismissed with prejudice. Hutts claim for declaratory judgment should be dismissed without prejudice as moot. Claims against defendants Hofmann and Ashburn in their individual capacities, Hutts Eighth Amendment claim, and all claims for compensatory damages should be dismissed without preju dice, subject to re-pleading within 30 days of the Courts Order on this Report and Recommendation. Failure to file a timely amended complaint will result in the dismissal of those claims with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 8/17/2009. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 7/30/09. (hbc)
August 18, 2009 28 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION granting in part, denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss. All claims brought against the defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED with prejudice. Hutts claims for declaratory judgment are DISMIS SED without prejudice as moot. Claims brought against defendants Hofmann and Ashburn in their individual capacities, Hutts Eighth Amendment claim, and all claims for compensatory damages are DISMISSED without prejudice as well, subject to re-pleading within 30 days of the date of this Order. Failure to file a timely amended complaint will result in the dismissal of those claims with prejudice.Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 8/18/2009. (jam)
September 2, 2010 56 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 52 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: 39 MOTION to Compel Defendant's to Respond to Interrogatories and Production of Documents Requests is DENIED and 36 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED. Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 22(b), a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Furthermore, it is certified that any appeal of this matter would not be taken in good faith, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3). Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 9/2/2010. (law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hutt v. Hofmann et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hutt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hofmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul . Brosseau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Seavey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Rutherford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Wood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Schmeltz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kearns
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Isenor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey Fronberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]