Rosetta Stone LTD v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Rosetta Stone LTD
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00736
Filed: July 10, 2009
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Arlington
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Presiding Judge: Gerald Bruce Lee
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2012 283 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. /s/ by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 10/31/12. (tbul, )
October 31, 2012 282 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice) by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
October 19, 2012 Alexandria Set/Reset Hearings: Summary Judgment/Reconsideration Hearing set for 11/9/2012 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee, per 281 Order. (tbul, )
October 19, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/1/2012 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee per 281 Order. (tbul, )
October 19, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/19/2012 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee pr 281 Order. (tbul, )
October 19, 2012 281 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part the 280 Joint Motion to Alter or Amend Deadlines. All motions for reconsideration/summary judgment shall be filed by 10/29/12, oppositions are due 11/5/12, any replies due by 11/7/12, and the the motions shall be noticed for 11/9/12 at 10:00 a.m. Further, a status conference will be held at 10:00 on 11/1/12. /s/ by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 10/19/12. (tbul, )
October 12, 2012 278 Featured Case ORDER granting 276 Motion to Amend/Correct. ORDERED that the Joint Discovery Plan (Dkt. No. 247) and corresponding Scheduling Order (Dkt. No. 248) shall be amended as follows --- (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 10/12/12. (klau, )
October 11, 2012 277 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of September 14, 2012, before Judge Gerald Bruce Lee, Court Reporter/Transcriber Renecia Wilson, Telephone number,703-501-1580. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/13/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/11/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2013.(wilson, renecia)
October 10, 2012 276 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct or Alter Deadlines by Google Inc., Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Warren)
October 10, 2012 275 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Rachel Elizabeth Epstein and Certification of Local Counsel Odin, Feldman & Pittleman, P.C. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3239976. by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen)
October 9, 2012 274 Featured Case ORDER granting 271 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 10/9/2012. (klau, )
October 9, 2012 273 Featured Case ORDER granting 272 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 10/9/2012. (klau, )
October 3, 2012 272 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas R. Watson and Certification of Local Counsel Odin, Feldman & Pittleman, P.C. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3230330. by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen)
October 3, 2012 271 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Timothy Allen Butler and Certification of Local Counsel Odin, Feldman & Pittleman, P.C. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3230302. by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen)
September 27, 2012 270 Featured Case ORDER that Defendant's 249 Motion to Amend/Correct is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 9/27/12. (klau, )
September 14, 2012 269 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee:Motion Hearing held on 9/14/2012 re: 250 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) filed by Google Inc. Appearances: Warren Allen, Mitchell Ettinger, Jen Spaziano for Pltff; Jonathan Frieden, Margaret Caruso for Deft. Heard and T.U.A. (Court Reporter R. Wilson.)(tbul, )
September 5, 2012 268 Featured Case ORDER granting 265 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 9/5/2012. (klau, )
September 5, 2012 267 Featured Case ORDER granting 266 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 9/5/12. (klau, )
August 31, 2012 266 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauryn Kay Fraas and Certification of Local Counsel Warren T. Allen II Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3184961. by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
August 31, 2012 265 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul McCrae Kerlin and Certification of Local Counsel Warren T. Allen II Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3184950. by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
August 30, 2012 264 Featured Case ORDER For good cause shown, no additional findings being necessary, the 252 Motion to Seal is GRANTED, and the brief docketed as no. 257 will remain sealed. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 8/30/2012. (stas)
August 30, 2012 Per TRJ chambers motions set for 8/31/12 on papers (clar, )
August 29, 2012 263 REPLY Brief in Support re 250 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) filed by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen) Modified text on 8/30/2012 (klau, ).
August 24, 2012 262 Declaration re 261 Opposition (Declaration of J. Spaziano In Support of Rosetta Stone Ltd's Opposition to Google, Inc.'s Omnibus Motion in Limine) by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits to J. Spaziano Declaration)(Allen, Warren)
August 24, 2012 261 Opposition to 250 Google Inc.'s Omnibus Motion in Limine filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren) Modified text on 8/27/2012 (klau, ).
August 23, 2012 Reset Deadlines as to 250 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus). Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2012 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (clar, )
August 22, 2012 Reset Deadlines as to 250 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus). Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2012 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (clar, )
August 20, 2012 260 Featured Case ORDER granting 258 Motion to Amend/Correct, ORDERED that the Joint Discovery Plan (Dkt. No. 247) and corresponding SchedulingOrder (Dkt. No. 248) shall be amended as follows 4. Motions in Limine --- ORDERED that, all other deadlines will remain unchanged (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 8/20/2012. (klau, )
August 17, 2012 259 NOTICE by Google Inc. of Change of Address for Counsel of Record (Frieden, Jonathan)
August 17, 2012 258 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct or Alter Deadlines by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cobb, Stephen)
August 16, 2012 257 Sealed Document - Defendant Google Inc.'s Brief in Support of Omnibus Motion in Lime re 251 Brief in Support. (klau, )
August 16, 2012 256 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of June 13, 2012, before Judge Theresa C. Buchanan, Court Reporter/Transcriber Renecia Wilson, Telephone number,703-501-1580. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2012.(wilson, renecia)
August 15, 2012 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. re 252 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed). (tche )
August 15, 2012 Set Deadline as to 252 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed). - Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2012 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (tche)
August 15, 2012 Set Deadline as to 250 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus). - Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2012 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (tche)
August 15, 2012 255 Notice of Hearing Date 08/31/2012 at 10 a.m. re 252 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) (Cobb, Stephen)
August 15, 2012 254 Notice of Hearing Date 08/31/2012 at 10 a.m. re 250 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) (Cobb, Stephen)
August 15, 2012 253 Memorandum in Support re 252 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) filed by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen)
August 15, 2012 252 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen)
August 15, 2012 251 Brief in Support to 250 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) (Portions Filed Under Seal) filed by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen)
August 15, 2012 250 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen)
August 10, 2012 249 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Deadlines by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cobb, Stephen)
July 17, 2012 248 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER that the Joint Proposed Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless modified by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 7/17/2012. (klau, )
July 17, 2012 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan no longer assigned to the case. (rban, )
July 13, 2012 247 Discovery Plan by Google Inc., Rosetta Stone LTD.(Allen, Warren)
July 10, 2012 Set Hearings: Jury Trial set for 12/3/2012 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee, per chambers of Judge Lee and Magistrate Judge Buchanan. 8 days: 12/3-6 and 12/10-13. (tbul, )
June 20, 2012 246 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (First Amended) and Affirmative Defenses by Google Inc..(Cobb, Stephen) Modified text on 6/21/2012 (klau, ).
June 19, 2012 245 Featured Case ORDER granting 243 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 6/19/12. (tfitz, )
June 13, 2012 244 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan:Status Conference held on 6/13/2012. Appearances of counsel for pltf. and deft. The parties will select a trial date and then contact chambers to schedule a telephone conference. Per deft. atty the answer to the complaint will be filed within one (1) week. (DE # 243)Pro hac vice motion/application-GRANTED (orally). (Tape #FTR.)(tfitz, )
June 13, 2012 243 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew H. Schapiro and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen A. Cobb Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3077687. by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen)
June 13, 2012 242 NOTICE - Pursuant to the Local Rules of this Court and the E-Filing Policies and Procedures manual, electronic case filing is mandatory as well as Pro Hac Vice application (effective 11/7/2011 - Online Fee Payment for Motions for Pro Hac Vice); therefore, paper documents (Pro Hac Vice Application for Andrew H. Schapiro together with check no. 103788 in the amount of $75.00) were returned to defendant counsel Stephen Cobb. (klau, )
May 1, 2012 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/13/2012 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (tfitz, )
May 1, 2012 241 USCA Mandate re 232 Notice of Appeal. The judgment of this court, entered 4/9/2012, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of FRAP. (rban, )
April 9, 2012 240 USCA JUDGMENT as to 232 Notice of Appeal filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. In accordance with the decision of this court, the judgment of the district court is affirmed in part and vacated in part. This case is remanded to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the court's decision. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with FRAP 41. (rban, )
April 9, 2012 239 PUBLISHED Opinion of USCA, decided 4/9/2012 re 232 Notice of Appeal, Affirmed in Part, Vacated in Part, and Remanded.(rban, )
January 18, 2011 238 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 232 Notice of Appeal filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. The court grants the motion to reconsider its order extending the filing time to file a response to the motions for leave to intervene and unseal documents until January 25, 2011, and extends the time for filing a response to the motions to January 31, 2011. (nmck, )
December 14, 2010 237 Featured Case STIPULATED ORDER that Google is the "prevailing party" pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1). As a result, Google is entitled to the stipulated quantum of costs in the amount of $79,500.00. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 12/14/10. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(klau, )
September 1, 2010 236 USCA Case Number 10-2007 4th Circuit, case manager L. Jernigan for 232 Notice of Appeal filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (nmck, )
September 1, 2010 235 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 232 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (nmck, )
August 31, 2010 234 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 14683015853 re 232 Notice of Appeal filed by Rosetta Stone LTD (nmck, )
August 31, 2010 233 STIPULATION Regarding Quantum of Potentially Allowable Costs by Google Inc., Rosetta Stone LTD. (Cobb, Stephen)
August 31, 2010 232 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 228 Judgment, by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
August 17, 2010 231 BILL OF COSTS in the amount of $79,511.47 for Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cobb, Stephen) Modified text on 8/18/2010 (klau, ).
August 17, 2010 Notice of Correction re 230 Bill of Costs, The signature block on the document does not match the filing users login. The filing user has been notified and has been asked to refile the document. (klau, )
August 16, 2010 230 BILL OF COSTS by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cobb, Stephen)
August 3, 2010 228 FINAL JUDGMENT Pursuant to the order of this Court entered on April 28, 2010 and in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor of Defendant Google Inc. and against Plaintiff Rosetta Stone Ltd. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 8/3/10. (klau, )
August 3, 2010 227 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION re Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 8/3/10. (klau, )
August 2, 2010 229 Featured Case ORDER that Google's 155 Objections to Evidence and Motion to Strike are OVERRULED and DENIED (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 8/2/10. (klau, )
August 2, 2010 226 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER re 94 Defendant Google Inc's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 8/2/10. (klau, )
May 13, 2010 225 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript re 224 Transcript, (klau, )
May 12, 2010 224 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 23, 2010, before Judge Theresa C. Buchanan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Renecia Wilson, Telephone number,703 501-1580. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/12/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2010.(wilson, renecia)
May 6, 2010 223 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript re 222 Transcript, (klau, )
May 5, 2010 222 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 23, 2010, before Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. Court Reporter/Transcriber Renecia Wilson, Telephone number,703 501-1580. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/4/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2010.(wilson, renecia)
May 4, 2010 221 Objections to 199 Order dated 4/23/10 Denying Motion for Sanctions, filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren) Modified text on 5/5/2010 (klau, ).
April 30, 2010 220 Featured Case ORDER denying 120 Motion to Exclude. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 4/30/2010. (tche)
April 28, 2010 218 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiff's 103 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability is DENIED. ORDERED that Defendant's 112 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Omnibus 179 Motion in Limine is MOOT. ORDERED that Plaintiff's and Defendant's 185 Joint Motion to Seal is MOOT. ORDERED that Defendant's Omnibus 189 Motion in Limine is MOOT. ORDERED that Plaintiff's and Defendant's 201 Joint Motion to Use the Courtroom Presentation System and to Bring Electronic Equipment Into Courthouse for Use During Trial and Memorandum in Support is MOOT. ORDERED that Plaintiff's and Defendant's 203 Joint Motion to Submit Electronic Copies of Trial Exhibits and Memorandum in Support is MOOT. The time for appeal will not run until the Court issues the Memorandum Opinion and Judgement Order in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58.. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 4/28/10. (klau, )
April 28, 2010 217 Featured Case ORDER For the reasons to be stated in the Court's forthcoming Memorandum Order, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's 94 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 4/28/10. (klau, )
April 28, 2010 216 Featured Case ORDER granting 132 Joint Motion to Seal, 1. The filings identified above reference documents, testimony, and information that relate to business practices and internal communications that are confidential and proprietary, the public disclosure of which would be harmful to Rosetta Stone's and/or Google's business interests. 2. Reasonable public notice of the sealing of these documents has been given through the filings in this case. 3. No less restrictive method would adequately preserve the confidential and proprietary nature of the information at issue (see order for details).. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 4/28/10. (klau, )
April 28, 2010 Per GBL Chambers motions set for 4/30/2010 are on papers. (stas)
April 27, 2010 215 Opposition to 189 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (UNDER SEAL) (pmil)
April 27, 2010 214 Declaration re 213 Memorandum in Opposition for Jonathan B. Oblak by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Under Seal), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Under Seal), # 6 Exhibit 6 (Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit 7 (Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit 8 (Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit 9 (Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit 10 (Under Seal), # 11 Exhibit 11 (Under Seal), # 12 Exhibit 12 (Under Seal), # 13 Exhibit 13 (Under Seal), # 14 Exhibit 14 (Under Seal), # 15 Exhibit 15 (Under Seal), # 16 Exhibit 16 (Under Seal), # 17 Exhibit 17 (Under Seal), # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19 (Under Seal), # 20 Exhibit 20 (Under Seal))(Cobb, Stephen) (EXHIBITS 1-17 AND 19 & 20 TO DECLARATION RE: MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION FILED UNDER SEAL IN CIVIL VAULT). Modified to edit text on 4/29/2010 (tfitz, ).
April 27, 2010 213 Memorandum in Opposition re 179 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) (portions under seal) filed by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen)(PORTIONS OF MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION FILED UNDER SEAL IN CIVIL VAULT). Modified to edit text on 4/29/2010 (tfitz, ).
April 27, 2010 212 Declaration re 211 Response in Opposition to Motion of Jennifer L. Spaziano by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit 8 (Filed Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit 9 (Filed Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit 10 (Filed Under Seal), # 11 Exhibit 11 (Filed Under Seal))(Allen, Warren) (UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS FILED IN CIVIL VAULT) Modified on 4/27/2010 to add text(pmil).
April 27, 2010 211 Opposition (redacted) re 189 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren) Modified text on 4/28/2010 (klau, ).
April 27, 2010 210 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript re 204 Transcript,, (klau, )
April 26, 2010 209 NOTICE by Google Inc. (pursuant to Local Rule 80(F)) (Cobb, Stephen)
April 26, 2010 208 Defendant Google Inc.'s Proposed Jury Instructions by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen)
April 26, 2010 207 Proposed Voir Dire by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Cobb, Stephen)
April 26, 2010 206 Proposed Jury Instructions by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
April 26, 2010 205 Proposed Voir Dire by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
April 26, 2010 204 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 19, 2010, before Judge Theresa Buchanan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Renecia Wilson, Telephone number,703 501-1580. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/28/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2010.(wilson, renecia)
April 26, 2010 203 Joint MOTION TO SUBMIT ELECTRONIC COPIES OF TRIAL EXHIBITS AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Google Inc., Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Warren)
April 26, 2010 202 Featured Case PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SEAL is GRANTED. See Order for specific details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 04/23/2010. (mpee, )
April 23, 2010 219 SUBJECT TO DECEMBER 14, 2009 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Demonstrative Exhibit of Summary Judgment Argument handed up to the Court on 4/23/10, during the argument (hard copy only, in file room). (tbul, )
April 23, 2010 201 Joint MOTION TO USE THE COURTROOM PRESENTATION SYSTEM AND TO BRING ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT INTO COURTHOUSE FOR USE DURING TRIAL AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Google Inc., Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Warren)
April 23, 2010 200 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee: Motion Hearing held on 4/23/2010 re: 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (heard & T.U.A.), and 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Google Inc. (heard & T.U.A.) Appearances: Warren Allen for Pltff; Jonathan Frieden for Deft. Order to follow. (Court Reporter R. Wilson.) (tbul, )
April 23, 2010 199 Featured Case FOR REASONS stated from the bench and in accord with specific rulings and instructions thereto, it is ORDERED that plaintiff's 173 Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiff's Unopposed 170 Motion to Seal is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 04/23/2010. (mpee, )
April 23, 2010 198 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan: Motion Hearing held on 4/23/2010. Appearances of Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant. re 173 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Rosetta Stone LTD is ARGUED and DENIED. 170 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) filed by Rosetta Stone LTD is GRANTED. ORDER TO FOLLOW. (Tape #ftr.) (mpee, )
April 22, 2010 197 Supplemental Declaration of Jennifer L. Spaziano(Redacted) re 173 MOTION for Sanctions (Filed In Part Under Seal) by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren) Modified on 4/23/2010 re Received Original on 4/22/10 (UNDER SEAL)(klau, ).
April 21, 2010 196 CERTIFICATE of Service for Declaration of Jonathan B. Oblak re 194 Declaration,, by Stephen Andrew Cobb on behalf of Google Inc. (Cobb, Stephen)
April 21, 2010 195 CERTIFICATE of Service for Declaration of Margret M. Caruso re 193 Declaration, by Stephen Andrew Cobb on behalf of Google Inc. (Cobb, Stephen)
April 21, 2010 194 Declaration of Jonathan B. Oblak (Under Seal) re 192 Memorandum in Opposition by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Under Seal), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Under Seal), # 6 Exhibit 6 (Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit 7 (Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit 8 (Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit 9 (Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit 10 (Under Seal), # 11 Exhibit 11 (Under Seal), # 12 Exhibit 12 (Under Seal), # 13 Exhibit 13 (Under Seal), # 14 Exhibit 14 (Under Seal), # 15 Exhibit 15 (Under Seal))(Cobb, Stephen) Modified on 4/22/2010 re Received Under Seal copy on 4/22/10 in a white binder (UNDER SEAL) (klau, ).
April 21, 2010 193 Declaration of Margret M. Caruso (Under Seal) re 192 Memorandum in Opposition by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Under Seal), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Under Seal), # 6 Exhibit 6 (Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit 7 (Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit 8 (Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit 9 (Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit 10 (Under Seal), # 11 Exhibit 11 (Under Seal), # 12 Exhibit 12 (Under Seal))(Cobb, Stephen) Modified on 4/22/2010 re Received Under Seal copy on 4/22/10 in a white binder (UNDER SEAL)(klau, ).
April 21, 2010 192 (Redacted) Memorandum in Opposition re 173 MOTION for Sanctions (Portions Filed Under Seal) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kris Brewer (Under Seal))(Cobb, Stephen) Modified on 4/22/2010 re Received Under Seal copy of Memorandum and Declaration on 4/22/10 in a white binder (UNDER SEAL) (klau, ).
April 21, 2010 Set Deadlines as to 189 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus), 185 Joint MOTION to Seal, 179 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus). Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2010 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (clar, )
April 20, 2010 191 Notice of Hearing Date set for 04/30/2010 re 189 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) (Cobb, Stephen)
April 20, 2010 190 Brief in Support to 189 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus), 188 Declaration,,,, (Portions Filed Under Seal) filed by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen) Modified on 4/26/2010 re Received Under Seal copy on 4/21/10 in a black binder (UNDER SEAL) (klau, ).
April 20, 2010 189 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen)
April 20, 2010 188 Declaration of Jonathan B. Oblak re 190 Brief in support to 189 Motion in Limine (Omnibus) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5 (portions filed under seal), # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7 (portions filed under seal), # 8 Exhibit 8 (portions filed under seal), # 9 Exhibit 9 (portions filed under seal), # 10 Exhibit 10 (filed under seal), # 11 Exhibit 11 (filed under seal), # 12 Exhibit 12 (filed under seal), # 13 Exhibit 13 (filed under seal), # 14 Exhibit 14 (filed under seal), # 15 Exhibit 15 (filed under seal), # 16 Exhibit 16 (filed under seal), # 17 Exhibit 17 (filed under seal), # 18 Exhibit 18 (filed under seal), # 19 Exhibit 19 (filed under seal), # 20 Exhibit 20 (filed under seal), # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24 (filed under seal), # 25 Exhibit 25 (filed under seal), # 26 Exhibit 26 (filed under seal), # 27 Exhibit 27 (filed under seal), # 28 Exhibit 28 (filed under seal), # 29 Exhibit 29 (filed under seal), # 30 Exhibit 30 (filed under seal), # 31 Exhibit 31 (filed under seal), # 32 Exhibit 32 (filed under seal), # 33 Exhibit 33)(Cobb, Stephen) Modified text on 4/21/2010 (klau, ). Modified on 4/21/2010 (clar, ). (Received UNDER SEAL exhibits on 4/21/10 and placed in vault)
April 20, 2010 187 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 30, 2010 re 185 Joint MOTION to Seal (Allen, Warren)
April 20, 2010 186 Memorandum in Support re 185 Joint MOTION to Seal filed by Google Inc., Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
April 20, 2010 185 Joint MOTION to Seal by Google Inc., Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Warren)
April 20, 2010 184 Declaration re 183 Response in Opposition to Motion of Jennifer L. Spaziano by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ALL EXHIBITS FILED UNDER SEAL)(Allen, Warren) Modified on 4/21/2010 re Received Exhibits on 4/20/10 (UNDER SEAL)(klau, ).
April 20, 2010 183 RESPONSE in Opposition re 155 MOTION to Strike and Objections to Evidence (Filed in Part Under Seal) filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren) Modified on 4/21/2010 re Received Original on 4/20/10 (UNDER SEAL)(klau, ).
April 20, 2010 182 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 30, 2010 re 179 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) (Allen, Warren)
April 20, 2010 181 Declaration re 179 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) of Jennifer L. Spaziano by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 9 (EXHIBITS 2, 6, 7, 8 FILED UNDER SEAL)(Allen, Warren) Modified on text 4/21/2010 (clar, ). (Received exhibits 2,6,7,8 on 4/20/10 filed UNDER SEAL and placed in vault)
April 20, 2010 180 Memorandum in Support re 179 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) Filed in Part Under Seal filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren) Modified on 4/21/2010 (clar, ). (in re: Received Original on 4/20/10 UNDER SEAL)
April 20, 2010 179 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Warren)
April 19, 2010 178 Subpoena(s) Returned. (Allen, Warren)
April 19, 2010 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Buchanan. 173 MOTION for Sanctions, 170 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) (clar, )
April 19, 2010 Set Deadlines as to 170 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed), 173 MOTION for Sanctions. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (clar, )
April 16, 2010 177 Featured Case ORDER that 100 Joint Motion to Seal is GRANTED: 1. The filings identified above reference documents, testimony, and information that relate to business practices and internal communications that are confidential and proprietary, the public disclosure of which would be harmful to Rosetta Stone's and/or Google's business interests. 2. Reasonable public notice of the sealing of these documents has been given through the filings in this case. 3. No less restrictive method would adequately preserve the confidential and proprietary nature of the information at issue (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 4/16/10. (klau, )
April 16, 2010 176 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 23, 2010 re 173 MOTION for Sanctions (Allen, Warren)
April 16, 2010 175 Declaration re 173 MOTION for Sanctions of Jennifer Spaziano by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 17 (Exhibits 3 - 9 and 12 - 14 Filed Under Seal))(Allen, Warren) Unredacted Version received and placed in civil vault. Modified on 4/19/2010 (tche).
April 16, 2010 174 Memorandum in Support re 173 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren) Unredacted Version received and placed in civil vault. Modified on 4/19/2010 (tche).
April 16, 2010 173 MOTION for Sanctions by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
April 16, 2010 172 Notice of Hearing Date ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SEAL set for April 23, 2010 re 170 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) (Allen, Warren)
April 16, 2010 171 Memorandum in Support re 170 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
April 16, 2010 170 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Warren)
April 14, 2010 169 Reply Brief in Support of 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (clar, ) (UNDER SEAL) Modified text on 4/16/2010 (clar, ).
April 14, 2010 168 REPLY Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Its re 120 MOTION to Exclude Expert Report and Opinion of Dr. Kent Van Liere (portions under seal) filed by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen) Modified on 4/15/2010 re Received Under Seal copy on 4/15/10 (UNDER SEAL) (klau, ).
April 14, 2010 167 REPLY Memorandum in Further Support of Its 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment (portions under seal) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thai Le (Under Seal), # 2 Declaration of Bill Lloyd (Under Seal))(Cobb, Stephen) Modified on 4/15/2010 re Received Under Seal copy on 4/15/10 (UNDER SEAL)(klau, ).
April 14, 2010 166 CERTIFICATE of Service for Declaration of Henry Lien in Support of Google's Reply Memorandum re 165 Declaration by Stephen Andrew Cobb on behalf of Google Inc. (Cobb, Stephen)
April 14, 2010 165 Declaration of Henry Lien in Support of Google's Reply Memorandum (portions under seal) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 (Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Under Seal))(Cobb, Stephen) Modified on 4/15/2010 re Received Under Seal Copy on 4/15/10 (UNDER SEAL) (klau, ).
April 14, 2010 164 REPLY (Redacted) Brief in Support of Its 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren) Modified text on 4/15/2010 (klau, ).
April 14, 2010 163 Objection to 151 Declaration, 150 Declaration,,, filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
April 14, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan: Settlement Conference held on 4/14/2010. Case did not settle. (mpee, )
April 12, 2010 Set Deadlines as to 155 MOTION to Strike and Objections to Evidence. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2010 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (clar, )
April 9, 2010 162 Objection to 141 Witness List and Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosures filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cobb, Stephen)
April 9, 2010 161 CERTIFICATE of Service to Google Inc.'s Opposition to Rosetta Stone's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re 153 Memorandum in Opposition by Stephen Andrew Cobb on behalf of Google Inc. (Cobb, Stephen)
April 9, 2010 160 CERTIFICATE of Service for Declaration of Thai Le re 152 Declaration by Stephen Andrew Cobb on behalf of Google Inc. (Cobb, Stephen)
April 9, 2010 159 CERTIFICATE of Service for Declaration of Kris Brewer re 151 Declaration by Stephen Andrew Cobb on behalf of Google Inc. (Cobb, Stephen)
April 9, 2010 158 CERTIFICATE of Service for Declaration of Henry Lien re 150 Declaration,,, by Stephen Andrew Cobb on behalf of Google Inc. (Cobb, Stephen)
April 9, 2010 157 Notice of Hearing Date re 155 MOTION to Strike and Objections to Evidence (Cobb, Stephen)
April 9, 2010 156 Memorandum in Support (Redacted) re 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 155 MOTION to Strike and Objections to Evidence (Portions Under Seal) filed by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen) Modified text on 4/12/2010 re Received Under Seal copy on 4/12/10 (UNDER SEAL)(klau, .
April 9, 2010 155 MOTION to Strike and Objections to Evidence by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen)
April 9, 2010 154 Objection to 143 Rule 26 Disclosure , Exhibit List and Witness List filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
April 9, 2010 153 Opposition (redacted) re 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen) Modified text on 4/12/2010 re Received Under Seal copy on 4/12/10 in a white binder (UNDER SEAL) (klau, ).
April 9, 2010 152 Declaration of Thai Le in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability by Google Inc.. (Cobb, Stephen) Modified text on 4/12/2010 re Received Under Seal copy on 4/12/10 in a white binder (UNDER SEAL) (klau, ).
April 9, 2010 151 Declaration of Kris Brewer by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cobb, Stephen) Modified text on 4/12/2010 re Received Under Seal copy on 4/12/10 in a white binder ( UNDER SEAL) (klau, ).
April 9, 2010 150 Declaration of Henry Lien by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37)(Cobb, Stephen) Modified text on 4/12/2010 re Received Under Seal Exhibits in a white binder on 4/12/10 (UNDER SEAL )(klau, ).
April 9, 2010 149 Declaration re 148 Response in Opposition to Motion, 147 Response in Opposition to Motion of Jennifer L. Spaziano by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 70 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Spaziano)(Allen, Warren) Modified on 4/12/2010 re Received original declaration & exhibits in one black binder on 4/9/10 (UNDER SEAL) (klau, ).
April 9, 2010 148 Opposition re 120 MOTION to Exclude Expert Report and Opinion of Dr. Kent Van Liere filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren) Modified text on 4/12/2010 re Received Original on 4/9/10 (UNDER SEAL) (klau, ).
April 9, 2010 147 Opposition re 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren) Modified text on 4/12/2010 re Received Original on 4/9/10 (UNDER SEAL) (klau, ).
April 9, 2010 146 Objection to 123 Declaration, 124 Declaration, 120 MOTION to Exclude Expert Report and Opinion of Dr. Kent Van Liere, 114 Declaration, 117 Declaration, 116 Declaration,, filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
April 9, 2010 Set Deadlines as to 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2010 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (clar, )
April 7, 2010 Reset Deadlines as to 94 MOTION to Dismiss the Seventh Cause of Action alleged in Rosetta Stone's First Amended Complaint. -- Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2010 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (tche)
April 7, 2010 145 Featured Case ORDER granting 139 Motion to Continue Hearing. ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED: Google's Motion to Dismiss Count VII of the First Amended Complaint shall be heard on April 23, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 4/7/2010. (tche)
April 5, 2010 144 REPLY to Response to Motion re 94 MOTION to Dismiss the Seventh Cause of Action alleged in Rosetta Stone's First Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc.. (Frieden, Jonathan)
April 2, 2010 143 Rule 26 Disclosure by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cobb, Stephen)
April 2, 2010 142 Rule 26 Disclosure by Google Inc., Rosetta Stone LTD. (Cobb, Stephen)
April 2, 2010 141 Rule 26(a)(3) Exhibit and Witness List by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
April 2, 2010 140 Memorandum in Support re 139 MOTION to Continue April 9, 2010 Hearing on Google's Motion to Dismiss Count VII filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
April 2, 2010 139 Unopposed MOTION to Continue April 9, 2010 Hearing on Google's Motion to Dismiss Count VII by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Continuing Hearing)(Allen, Warren)
March 31, 2010 138 Featured Case ORDER that the Joint Motion is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 3/31/10. (UNDER SEAL)(klau, )
March 30, 2010 136 Opposition to 94 MOTION to Dismiss the Seventh Cause of Action alleged in Rosetta Stone's First Amended Complaint filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren) Modified text on 3/31/2010 (klau, ).
March 29, 2010 137 Featured Case ORDER granting application for Henry Lien to appear Pro hac vice Filing fee paid $ 50, receipt number 14683012488. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 3/29/10. (Attachments: # 1 Letter, # 2 Receipt)(klau, )
March 29, 2010 135 NOTICE of Filing by Google Inc. re 118 Memorandum in Support (Frieden, Jonathan) Modified text on 3/30/2010 re Received under seal copy of Memorandum in Support on 3/30/10 (UNDER SEAL) (klau, ).
March 29, 2010 Set Deadlines as to 132 Joint MOTION to Seal, 120 MOTION to Exclude Expert Report and Opinion of Dr. Kent Van Liere. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2010 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (clar, )
March 26, 2010 134 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 23, 2010 re 132 Joint MOTION to Seal (Allen, Warren)
March 26, 2010 133 Memorandum in Support re 132 Joint MOTION to Seal filed by Google Inc., Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
March 26, 2010 132 Joint MOTION to Seal by Google Inc., Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Warren)
March 26, 2010 131 Memorandum in Support (Redacted) re 120 MOTION to Exclude Expert Report and Opinion of Dr. Kent Van Liere filed by Google Inc.. (Frieden, Jonathan) (klau, ). Modified text on 4/12/2010 re Under Seal copy received on 4/12/10 (UNDER SEAL)(klau, ).
March 26, 2010 130 NOTICE by Google Inc. re 116 Declaration, Exhibit 45 to the Declaration of Margret M. Caruso (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 45)(Frieden, Jonathan)
March 26, 2010 129 CERTIFICATE of Service for Declaration of Edward A. Blair re 124 Declaration by Jonathan David Frieden on behalf of Google Inc. (Frieden, Jonathan)
March 26, 2010 128 CERTIFICATE of Service for Declaration of Cheryl Galvin re 123 Declaration by Jonathan David Frieden on behalf of Google Inc. (Frieden, Jonathan)
March 26, 2010 127 CERTIFICATE of Service for Declaration of Bill Lloyd re 117 Declaration by Jonathan David Frieden on behalf of Google Inc. (Frieden, Jonathan)
March 26, 2010 126 CERTIFICATE of Service for Declaration of Margret M. Caruso re 116 Declaration, by Jonathan David Frieden on behalf of Google Inc. (Frieden, Jonathan)
March 26, 2010 125 CERTIFICATE of Service for Declaration of Cory Louie re 114 Declaration by Jonathan David Frieden on behalf of Google Inc. (Frieden, Jonathan)
March 26, 2010 124 Declaration of Edward A. Blair, Ph.D. re 131 Memorandum in Support (portions filed under seal) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Frieden, Jonathan) Modified text on 3/29/2010 (clar, ). Modified text on 3/30/2010 re received under seal copy in black binder together with copy of memorandum in support on 3/29/10 (UNDER SEAL) (klau, ).
March 26, 2010 123 Declaration of Cheryl A. Galvin re 131 Memorandum in Support (portions filed under seal) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 7)(Frieden, Jonathan) Modified text on 3/29/2010 (clar, ). Modified text on 3/30/2010 re Received under seal copy in black binder on 3/29/10 (UNDER SEAL) (klau, ).
March 26, 2010 122 Notice of Hearing re 120 MOTION to Exclude Expert Report and Opinion of Dr. Kent Van Liere filed by Google Inc.. (Frieden, Jonathan) Modified text on 3/30/2010 (klau, ).
March 26, 2010 121 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 23, 2010 re 120 MOTION to Exclude Expert Report and Opinion of Dr. Kent Van Liere (Frieden, Jonathan)
March 26, 2010 120 MOTION to Exclude Expert Report and Opinion of Dr. Kent Van Liere by Google Inc.. (Frieden, Jonathan)
March 26, 2010 119 Declaration re 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Jennifer Spaziano by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 28, # 2 Exhibit A)(Allen, Warren)
March 26, 2010 118 Memorandum in Support (Redacted) re 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Google Inc.. (Frieden, Jonathan) Modified text on 4/12/2010 re Received Under Seal copy on 4/12/10 (UNDER SEAL (klau, ).
March 26, 2010 117 Declaration of Bill Lloyd re 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment (portions filed under seal) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 12)(Frieden, Jonathan) Modified text on 3/30/2010 re Received under seal copy in black binder on 3/29/10. ( UNDER SEAL) (klau, ).
March 26, 2010 Notice of Correction re: 114 Declaration re 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Cory Louie (portions filed under seal) by Google Inc. The filing user has been notified to file a separate Certificate of Service. (stas)
March 26, 2010 Notice of Correction re: 109 Declaration re 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Jennifer Spaziano by Rosetta Stone LTD. The filing user has been asked to refile the document with a correct signature for the declarant. (stas)
March 26, 2010 Set Deadline as to 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2010 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (stas)
March 26, 2010 116 Declaration of Margret M. Caruso re 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment (portions filed under seal) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Frieden, Jonathan) Modified text on 3/30/2010 re Received under seal copy in 4 separate black binder, Received one box of loose documents with top page stated as "Copy of Attachment to Exhibit No. 50. " with one CD in one of the black binders (UNDER SEAL)(klau, ).
March 26, 2010 115 Declaration of Edward A. Blair, Ph.D. re 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment (portions filed under seal) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Frieden, Jonathan) Modified text on 3/30/2010 re Received under seal copy in black binder on 3/29/10. (UNDER SEAL)(klau, ).
March 26, 2010 Notice of Correction re 100 Joint MOTION to Seal by Google Inc., Rosetta Stone LTD, 101 Memorandum in Support re 100 Joint MOTION to Seal filed by Google Inc., Rosetta Stone LTD, and 102 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 23, 2010 re 100 Joint MOTION to Seal. The filing user has been asked to refile the document with the correct signature block for co-filing counsel. (stas)
March 26, 2010 114 Declaration of Cory Louie re 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment (portions filed under seal) by Google Inc.. (Frieden, Jonathan) Modified text on 3/30/2010 re Received under seal copy in black binder on 3/29/10 ( UNDER SEAL) (klau, ).
March 26, 2010 113 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 23, 2010 re 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Frieden, Jonathan)
March 26, 2010 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Google Inc.. (Frieden, Jonathan)
March 26, 2010 111 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 23, 2010 re 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Allen, Warren)
March 26, 2010 110 Declaration re 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Van Leigh by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 6)(Allen, Warren) Under Seal copy received and placed in box on shelf in Civil Vault. Modified on 3/29/2010 (tche). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2010: # 2 Main Document) (klau, ).
March 26, 2010 109 Declaration re 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Jennifer Spaziano by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 28, # 2 Exhibit A)(Allen, Warren) Under Seal copy received and placed in box on shelf in Civil Vault. Modified on 3/29/2010 (tche).
March 26, 2010 108 Declaration re 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Jeanne May by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 6)(Allen, Warren)
March 26, 2010 107 Declaration re 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Eric Eichmann by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 5)(Allen, Warren) Under Seal copy received and placed in box on shelf in Civil Vault. Modified on 3/29/2010 (tche). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2010: # 2 Main Document) (klau, ).
March 26, 2010 106 Declaration re 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Jason Calhoun by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C, # 2 Exhibit D Part 1, # 3 Exhibit D Part 2, # 4 Exhibit E)(Allen, Warren) Under Seal copy received and placed in box on shelf in Civil Vault. Modified on 3/29/2010 (tche). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2010: # 5 Main Document) (klau, ).
March 26, 2010 105 Declaration re 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Tom Adams by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
March 26, 2010 104 Memorandum in Support re 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren) Under Seal copy received and placed in Civil Vault.(tche). Modified on 3/29/2010 (tche). (klau, ).
March 26, 2010 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Warren)
March 26, 2010 102 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 23, 2010 re 100 Joint MOTION to Seal (Allen, Warren)
March 26, 2010 101 Memorandum in Support re 100 Joint MOTION to Seal filed by Google Inc., Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
March 26, 2010 100 Joint MOTION to Seal by Google Inc., Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Warren)
March 24, 2010 Set Deadline as to 94 MOTION to Dismiss the Seventh Cause of Action alleged in Rosetta Stone's First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2010 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (stas)
March 24, 2010 99 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 9, 2010 re 94 MOTION to Dismiss the Seventh Cause of Action alleged in Rosetta Stone's First Amended Complaint (Cobb, Stephen)
March 24, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 4/14/2010 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (mpee, )
March 19, 2010 98 Featured Case ORDER granting application for Wendy Elizabeth Pearson to appear Pro hac vice Filing fee paid $ 50, receipt number 14683011822. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 3/19/10. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(klau, )
March 19, 2010 97 Featured Case ORDER granting application for Andrew Ryan Corcoran to appear Pro hac vice Filing fee paid $ 50, receipt number 14683011822. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 3/19/10. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(klau, )
March 19, 2010 Set Deadline as to 94 MOTION to Dismiss the Seventh Cause of Action alleged in Rosetta Stone's First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2010 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (Hearing date is untimely - attorney told to re-notice) (stas)
March 19, 2010 Notice of Correction re 96 Notice of Hearing Date set for 04/02/2010 re 94 MOTION to Dismiss the Seventh Cause of Action alleged in Rosetta Stone's First Amended Complaint. The filing user has been notified to file an Amended Notice of Hearing Date, as the Notice of Hearing Date set an untimely hearing. (stas)
March 19, 2010 96 Notice of Hearing Date set for 04/02/2010 re 94 MOTION to Dismiss the Seventh Cause of Action alleged in Rosetta Stone's First Amended Complaint (Frieden, Jonathan)
March 19, 2010 95 Memorandum in Support re 94 MOTION to Dismiss the Seventh Cause of Action alleged in Rosetta Stone's First Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc.. (Frieden, Jonathan)
March 19, 2010 94 MOTION to Dismiss the Seventh Cause of Action alleged in Rosetta Stone's First Amended Complaint by Google Inc.. (Frieden, Jonathan)
March 19, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 4/16/2010 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (mpee, )
March 16, 2010 93 NOTICE by Google Inc. RE Firm Name and Address Change for foreign counsel (Cobb, Stephen) Modified text on 3/17/2010 (klau, ).
March 8, 2010 92 Featured Case ORDER granting application for Amy Susan Park to appear Pro hac vice Filing fee paid $ 50, receipt number 14683011849. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 3/8/10. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(klau, )
March 8, 2010 91 Featured Case ORDER granting application for Jonathan Bacon Oblak to appear Pro hac vice Filing fee paid $ 50, receipt number 14683011673. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 3/8/10. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt, # 2 Letters)(klau, )
March 8, 2010 90 Featured Case ORDER granting application for Deborah Kay Brown to appear Pro hac vice Filing fee paid $ 50, receipt number 14683011916. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 3/8/10. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(klau, )
March 8, 2010 89 Featured Case ORDER granting application for John B. Quinn to appear Pro hac vice Filing fee paid $ 50, receipt number 14683011870. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 3/8/10. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt, # 2 Letter)(klau, )
March 8, 2010 88 Featured Case ORDER granting applicatin for Timothy Allen Butler to appear Pro hac vice Filing fee paid $ 50, receipt number 14683011871. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 3/8/10. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt, # 2 Letter)(klau, )
March 8, 2010 87 Featured Case ORDER granting application for Benjamin J. Gildin to appear Pro hac vice Filing fee paid $ 50, receipt number 14683011937. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 3/8/10. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt, # 2 Letter)(klau, )
March 5, 2010 86 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Google Inc., filed by Rosetta Stone LTD.(Allen, Warren) Modified text on 3/8/2010 (klau, ).
March 4, 2010 85 Featured Case ORDER that the 83 Consent Motion to Set or Amend Briefing Schedule is GRANTED. ORDERED that the parties shall file their summary judgment motions in this action by March 26,2010 and shall notice those motions for hearing on April 23,2010 at 10:00 a.m. ORDERED that, with respect to summary judgment motions, the parties shall file their responsive and rebuttal briefs in accordance with the schedule set forth in Local Rule 7(F)(1) and the Scheduling Order entered on October 20,2009 but, in any event, no later than April 14,2010. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 3/4/10. (klau, )
March 4, 2010 84 Featured Case ORDER that plaintiff's 81 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 3/4/10. (klau, )
March 3, 2010 83 Revised Consent MOTION to Set or Amend Briefing Schedule by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Frieden, Jonathan) Modified text on 3/4/2010 (klau, ).
March 3, 2010 82 Memorandum in Support re 81 MOTION for Leave to File A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
March 3, 2010 81 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Redline First Amended Complaint, # 3 Proposed Order)(Allen, Warren) Modified text on 3/4/2010 (klau, ).
March 3, 2010 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Andrew Cobb on behalf of Google Inc. (Cobb, Stephen)
March 1, 2010 Set Deadlines as to 77 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Pretrial Conference - Final, Set Hearings,, 65 NOTICE, Briefing Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2010 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (clar, )
February 26, 2010 79 Featured Case ORDER Granting Pro hac vice of Rachel Marie Kassabian; Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683011781. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 2/26/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(tche)
February 26, 2010 78 Notice of Hearing Date set for 03/05/2010 re 77 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Pretrial Conference - Final, Set Hearings,, 65 NOTICE, Briefing Schedule (Frieden, Jonathan)
February 26, 2010 77 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Pretrial Conference - Final, Set Hearings,, 65 NOTICE, Briefing Schedule by Rosetta Stone LTD, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Frieden, Jonathan)
February 23, 2010 76 Featured Case ORDER granting motion for Pro hac vice of David Brandon Leland Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683011678.. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 2/23/10. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(nmck, )
February 23, 2010 75 Featured Case ORDER granting motion for Pro hac vice of Mitchell Scott Ettinger Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683011678.. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 2/23/10. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(nmck, )
February 23, 2010 74 Featured Case ORDER granting motion for Pro hac vice of Thomas Jerome Nolan Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683011678.. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 2/23/10. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(nmck, )
February 23, 2010 73 Featured Case ORDER granting motion for Pro hac vice of Bernard Chi-Bung Shek Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683011678.. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 2/23/10. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(nmck, )
February 23, 2010 72 Featured Case ORDER granting motion for Pro hac vice of Claude Michael Stern Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683011647.. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 2/23/10. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt, # 2 letter)(nmck, )
February 23, 2010 71 Featured Case ORDER granting motion for Pro hac vice of Michael Daniel Powell Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683011673.. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 2/23/10. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt, # 2 letter)(nmck, )
February 23, 2010 70 Featured Case ORDER granting motion for Pro hac vice of Eman Sojoodi Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683011673.. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 2/23/10. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(nmck, )
February 23, 2010 69 Featured Case ORDER denying motion for Pro hac vice of Henry Lien, because counsel is not admitted to practice in another federal court Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683011673.. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 2/23/10. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(nmck, )
February 23, 2010 68 Featured Case ORDER granting motion for Pro hac vice of Evette Dionna Pennypacker Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683011673.. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 2/23/10. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(nmck, )
February 19, 2010 67 Featured Case FOR REASONS stated from the bench and in accord with specific rulings and instructions thereto, it is ORDERED that defendant's 55 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED; ORDERED that the plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Seal Opposition to Google's Motion for Protective ORDER 58 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 02/19/2010. (mpee, )
February 19, 2010 66 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan: Motion Hearing held on 2/19/2010. Appearances of counsel for the Plaintiff and Defendant. re 55 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions of its Three Highest-Ranking Executives filed by Google Inc., is ARGUED and GRANTED. 58 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Google Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order and the Declaration of Jennifer L. Spaziano in Support Thereof. filed by Rosetta Stone LTD is GRANTED (Tape #ftr.) (mpee, )
February 18, 2010 65 NOTICE from the Clerk's Office (in connection with a phone call from Margaret Russo) re: 64 Pretrial Conference - Final, Set Hearings, Minute Entry, that chambers has confirmed that the Court set a SJ motion for 4/23/10 @ 10:00 a.m. - the date was changed a few times during the hearing, and the last date specified was 4/23/10 - and 4/23/10 is the date that parties should notice their hearing for. (tbul, )
February 18, 2010 64 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee: Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/18/2010. Appearances: Counsel for Pltff and Deft. Jury Trial set for 5/3/2010 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. 6-day trial. SJ mot. to be filed on 3/16/10 w/ a hrg. to be held 4/23/10 @ 10:00. Oral Order granting Oral Motion for extension of time to exchange exhibits - now due 4/2/10.(Court Reporter None.) (tbul, )
February 18, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 4/7/2010 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (mpee, )
February 18, 2010 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Buchanan. 58 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Google Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order and the Declaration of Jennifer L. Spaziano in Support Thereof. (clar, )
February 18, 2010 Set Deadlines as to 58 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Google Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order and the Declaration of Jennifer L. Spaziano in Support Thereof.. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (clar, )
February 18, 2010 63 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript re 62 Transcript. (tche)
February 18, 2010 62 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 4, 2010, before Judge Theresa Buchanan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Renecia A. Wilson, Telephone number 703-501-1580. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2010.(wilson, renecia)
February 17, 2010 61 Notice of Hearing Date re 58 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Google Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order and the Declaration of Jennifer L. Spaziano in Support Thereof set for 2/19/2010 at 10:00 a.m.(Allen, Warren)
February 17, 2010 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re 55 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions of its Three Highest-Ranking Executives, (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF JENNIFER L. SPAZIANO IN SUPPORT OF ROSETTA STONE LTDS OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE INC.S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to Declaration, # 11 Exhibit J to Declaration, # 12 Exhibit K to Declaration, # 13 Exhibit L to Declaration, # 14 Exhibit M to Declaration, # 15 Exhibit N to Declaration)(Allen, Warren) Under Seal Opposition and Declaration received and placed in civil vault. Modified on 2/19/2010 (tche).
February 17, 2010 59 Memorandum in Support re 58 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Google Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order and the Declaration of Jennifer L. Spaziano in Support Thereof. filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren)
February 17, 2010 58 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Google Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order and the Declaration of Jennifer L. Spaziano in Support Thereof. by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Opposition to Google Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order, # 2 Proposed Order)(Allen, Warren)
February 17, 2010 Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 2/18/2010 at 09:15 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. Parties to appear earlier than originally scheduled time of 10:00 a.m. Please meet in Courtroom 601. (tbul, )
February 16, 2010 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Buchanan. 55 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions of its Three Highest-Ranking Executives (clar, )
February 16, 2010 Set Deadlines as to 55 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions of its Three Highest-Ranking Executives. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (clar, )
February 12, 2010 57 Notice of Hearing Date set for 02/19/2010 re 55 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions of its Three Highest-Ranking Executives (Frieden, Jonathan)
February 12, 2010 56 Memorandum in Support re 55 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions of its Three Highest-Ranking Executives filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Frieden, Jonathan)
February 12, 2010 55 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions of its Three Highest-Ranking Executives by Google Inc.. (Frieden, Jonathan)
February 4, 2010 54 Featured Case FOR REASONS stated from the bench and in accord with specific rulings and instructions thereto, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 31 is granted in part and denied in part. ORDERED that the deadline to complete discovery shall be extended to March 12, 2010. The pretrial conference shall remain scheduled for February 18, 2010. The parties shall file and exchange appropriate pretrial submissions by March 24, 2010, with objections thereto to be filed by March 31, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 02/04/2010. (mpee, )
February 4, 2010 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan: Motion Hearing held on 2/4/2010 re 31 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. Appearances of counsel for Plaintiff and Deft. Motion Argued and Granted in part/Denied in part. ORDER TO FOLLOW. (Tape #ftr.) (mpee, )
February 2, 2010 52 Featured Case ORDER granting 50 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Terence P. Ross terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 2/2/10. (rban, )
January 29, 2010 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 3/15/2010. (klau, )
January 29, 2010 51 Featured Case ORDER that 48 Motion to Extend Discovery Cutoff is GRANTED. All discovery shall be commenced in time to be completed by March 15, 2010. The parties shall submit to the Court on March 22, 2010 the Fed. R. Civ. P.26(a)(3) disclosures --- (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 1/29/10. (klau, )
January 26, 2010 50 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ross, Terence)
January 25, 2010 49 Memorandum in Support re 48 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Discovery Cutoff filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Allen, Warren) Modified text on 1/26/2010 (klau, ).
January 25, 2010 48 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Discovery Cutoff by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Warren) Modified text on 1/26/2010 (klau, ).
January 22, 2010 47 Featured Case ORDER for Pro hac vice of Jennifer Lynn Spaziano Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683011093. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 1/22/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(rban, )
January 22, 2010 46 Featured Case ORDER for Pro hac vice of Clifford Myer Sloan Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683011092. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 1/22/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(rban, )
January 21, 2010 45 Featured Case ORDER re Plaintiff's 31 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents. The motion, which was scheduled to be heard by this Court on January 22, 2010, will be continued until February 4, 2010 at 2:00 pm.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 1/21/10. (klau, )
January 21, 2010 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren Thomas Allen, II on behalf of Rosetta Stone LTD (Allen, Warren)
January 21, 2010 Per TCB Chambers Reset Deadline as to 31 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents. Motion Hearing reset for 2/4/2010 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (stas)
January 20, 2010 43 Memorandum Supplemental to 39 Memorandum in Opposition to plaintiff's Motion to compel Production of Documents filed by Google Inc.. (Frieden, Jonathan) Modified text on 1/21/2010 (klau, ).
January 20, 2010 42 Memorandum Supplemental to 31 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, 32 Memorandum in Support of MOTION to Compel filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Ross, Terence)
January 14, 2010 41 Featured Case ORDER THIS MATTER came before the Court on plaintiffs Motion to Compel. (Dkt. No. 31) The motion, which was scheduled to be heard by this Court on January 15, 2010, will be continued until January 22, 2010 at 10:00 am.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 1/14/10. (klau, )
January 14, 2010 Reset Deadlines as to 31 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (clar, )
January 13, 2010 40 NOTICE of Filing by Google Inc. re 39 Memorandum in Opposition, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3)(Frieden, Jonathan) Modified text on 1/14/2010 (klau, ).
January 13, 2010 39 Memorandum in Opposition re 31 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, 32 Memorandum in Support of MOTION to Compel filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Frieden, Jonathan)
January 12, 2010 38 Featured Case ORDER re 36 Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines for Expert Discovery, ORDERED THAT the deadline for the disclosure of defendant's expert witnesses is extended from January 13, 2010 to January 20, 2010; and the rebuttal expert witness disclosure deadline is extended from January 27, 2010 to February 4, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 1/12/10. (klau, )
January 12, 2010 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Buchanan. 36 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines for Expert Discovery (clar, )
January 12, 2010 Set Deadlines as to 36 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines for Expert Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (clar, )
January 11, 2010 37 Notice of Hearing Date set for 01/22/2010 re 36 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines for Expert Discovery (Frieden, Jonathan)
January 11, 2010 36 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines for Expert Discovery by Rosetta Stone LTD, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Frieden, Jonathan)
January 11, 2010 35 CERTIFICATE of Service re 31 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Terence P. Ross on behalf of Rosetta Stone LTD (Ross, Terence)
January 11, 2010 34 CERTIFICATE of Service re 33 Notice of Hearing Date by Terence P. Ross on behalf of Rosetta Stone LTD (Ross, Terence)
January 11, 2010 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Buchanan. 31 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (clar, )
January 11, 2010 Set Deadlines as to 31 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (clar, )
January 11, 2010 Notice of Correction re 33 Notice of Hearing Date, 31 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents. The filing user has been notified to file a separate Certificate of Service. (clar, )
January 11, 2010 Notice of Correction re 32 MOTION to Compel Memorandum. The filing user selected the wrong event. (Motion) was selected, and (Memorandum in Support) should have been selected. The docket has been corrected. (clar, )
January 8, 2010 33 Notice of Hearing Date set for January 15, 2010 re 31 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, 32 MOTION to Compel Memorandum (Ross, Terence)
January 8, 2010 32 Memorandum in Support of MOTION to Compel by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Ross, Terence) Modified text on 1/11/2010 (clar, ).
January 8, 2010 31 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ross, Terence)
January 4, 2010 30 Featured Case ORDER granting application for Cheryl Ann Galvin to appear Pro hac vice Filing fee paid $ 50, receipt number 14683010620. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 1/4/10. (Attachments: # 1 Letter, # 2 Receipt)(klau, )
December 17, 2009 29 STIPULATION Agreement Concerning Electronically Stored Information by Rosetta Stone LTD, Google Inc.. (Frieden, Jonathan)
December 14, 2009 28 Featured Case AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: Handling and labeling confidential materials (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 12/14/09. (klau, )
December 14, 2009 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Terence P. Ross on behalf of Rosetta Stone LTD (Ross, Terence)
December 11, 2009 26 MOTION for Protective Order (Unopposed) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Frieden, Jonathan)
October 20, 2009 25 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that: a. The Proposed Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court ---- (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 10/20/09. (klau, )
October 14, 2009 24 Joint Discovery Plan by Rosetta Stone LTD, Google Inc..(Frieden, Jonathan) Modified text on 10/15/2009 (klau, ).
October 2, 2009 22 ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Google Inc..(Frieden, Jonathan)
September 29, 2009 23 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2010 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. Discovery due by 2/12/2010 (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 9/29/09. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form, # 2 Pretrial Notice)(klau, )
September 28, 2009 21 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript re 20 Transcript. (tche)
September 25, 2009 20 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 18, 2009, before Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. Court Reporter/Transcriber Renecia A. Wilson, Telephone number 703-501-1580. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2009.(wilson, renecia)
September 21, 2009 19 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant Google's 12 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(3) (denied), or alternatively, pursuant to F. R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) (granted as to the false endorsement and conspiracy claims), for reasons stated in open court on 9/18/09. /s/ by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 9/18/09. (tbul, )
September 18, 2009 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee: Motion Hearing held on 9/18/2009 re: 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google Inc. Appearances: Terence Ross for Pltff; Jonathan Frieden,and Margaret Caruso pro hac vice, for Deft. Heard, findings stated from the bench, and granted in part and denied in part. Order to follow. (Court Reporter R. Wilson.) (tbul, )
September 14, 2009 17 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Google Inc.. (Frieden, Jonathan)
September 14, 2009 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Frieden, Jonathan)
September 9, 2009 15 Memorandum in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Ross, Terence)
August 24, 2009 Set Deadlines as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2009 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (krob)
August 21, 2009 14 Notice of Hearing Date set for 9/18/2009 re 12 MOTION to Dismiss (Frieden, Jonathan)
August 21, 2009 13 Memorandum in Support re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Frieden, Jonathan)
August 21, 2009 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Google Inc.. (Frieden, Jonathan)
August 14, 2009 11 Featured Case ORDER granting application for Margaret Mary Caruso to appear Pro hac vice Filing fee paid $ 50, receipt number 14683007691. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 8/14/09. (Attachments: # 1 Letters, # 2 Receipt)(klau, )
July 30, 2009 Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2009 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (tche)
July 30, 2009 10 Featured Case ORDERED that Defendant's time to file responsive pleadings is extended to 5:00 p.m. on August 21, 2009; that (1) any motion filed by Defendant on August 21, 2009 will be set for hearing on September 18, 2009; (2) Plaintiff shall file its response to any such motion no later than 5:00 p.m. on September 9, 2009; and (3) Defendant shall file its reply in support of such motion no later than 5:00 p.m. on September 14, 2009.Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 7/30/09. (tche)
July 27, 2009 Reset Deadlines as to 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleadings and Brief in Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2009 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (clar, )
July 27, 2009 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Buchanan. 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleadings and Brief in Support Thereof (clar, )
July 27, 2009 Set Deadlines as to 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleadings and Brief in Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (clar, )
July 24, 2009 9 Notice of Hearing Date set for 07/31/2009 re 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleadings and Brief in Support Thereof (Frieden, Jonathan)
July 24, 2009 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleadings and Brief in Support Thereof by Rosetta Stone LTD, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Frieden, Jonathan)
July 16, 2009 7 Affidavit of Service Returned Executed as to Google Inc. served on 7/14/2009, answer due 8/3/2009 (klau, )
July 12, 2009 6 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson no longer assigned to the case. (rban, )
July 10, 2009 5 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademarks 2761492, 2751189, 2781324, 2866000, 3339880, 3398548, 3454358, 3514220, 3554829, 3561922, 3570033, 3570034, 3569720, 3570015. (tche)
July 10, 2009 4 NOTICE of Appearance as counsel in this case for Plaintiff Rosetta Stone LTD by Terence P. Ross. (tche)
July 10, 2009 3 Summons Issued as to Google Inc. for service by private process server. (tche)
July 10, 2009 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Rosetta Stone LTD. (tche)
July 10, 2009 1 COMPLAINT against Google Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 14683007084.), filed by Rosetta Stone LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt)(tche)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosetta Stone LTD v. Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosetta Stone LTD
Represented By: Terence P. Ross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]