MiTile Ltd. v. Hasbro, Inc.

Plaintiff: MiTile Ltd.
Defendant: Hasbro, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00451
Filed: April 11, 2013
 
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Out of Country
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Presiding Judge: Gerald Bruce Lee
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2013 61 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: It is reasonable and customary for both associates and partners to work on the same motion and their time expended isnot duplicative, but appropriate. Therefore, the Court finds that defendant Hasbro, Inc., must pay plaintiff the total sum of $23,442.50, within 10 days. fees associated with motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 10/3/13. (gwalk, )
October 7, 2013 62 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 10/7/13. (gwalk, ) Modified on 10/8/2013 to add ORDER in the title (gwalk, ).
October 30, 2013 70 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 10/30/13. (See Order for Details).(gwalk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: MiTile Ltd. v. Hasbro, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MiTile Ltd.
Represented By: Eric Scott Barr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hasbro, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]