Hawkins v. Padrick et al

Defendant: Thomas Padrick, Gregory Terpin and Joseph Denardo
Plaintiff: James W. Hawkins, Jr.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00156
Filed: March 13, 2013
 
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Office: Richmond Office
County: Virginia Beach City
Presiding Judge: James R. Spencer
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2013 12 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 9/3/2013. Copy to Hawkins.(cmcc, )
May 28, 2014 23 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Copies mailed: yes. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 05/28/2014. (tjoh, )
May 28, 2014 24 Featured Case ORDER adopting re 21 Report and Recommendations. The Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and the Clerk is DIRECTED to note the disposition of the action for purposes of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Copies mailed: yes. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 05/28/2014. (tjoh, )
July 18, 2013 5 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 7/18/2013. Copy to Plaintiff.(cmcc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hawkins v. Padrick et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Padrick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Terpin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Denardo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Hawkins, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]