Page et al v. Virginia State Board of Elections et al

Plaintiff: Dawn Curry Page, Gloria Personhuballah and James Farkas
Defendant: Virginia State Board of Elections, Charlie Judd, Kimberly Bowers, Don Palmer and Kenneth Cuccinelli, II
Case Number: 3:2013cv00678
Filed: October 2, 2013
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Office: Richmond Office
County: Richmond City
0 Judge: Allyson K Duncan
1 Judge: Robert E. Payne
2 Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by United States Circuit Judge Allyson K. Duncan on 10/7/2014. (cmcc, )
February 23, 2015 137 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne, District Judge Liam O'Grady, and U.S. Circuit Judge Allyson K. Duncan on 02/23/2015. (jsmi, )
May 8, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 5/8/2014. Copies to counsel.(cmcc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page et al v. Virginia State Board of Elections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Curry Page
Represented By: John Michael Devaney
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Kevin Hamilton
Represented By: John Kuropatkin Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Personhuballah
Represented By: John Michael Devaney
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Kevin Hamilton
Represented By: John Kuropatkin Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Farkas
Represented By: John Michael Devaney
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Kevin Hamilton
Represented By: John Kuropatkin Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia State Board of Elections
Represented By: Mike Melis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Judd
Represented By: Mike Melis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Bowers
Represented By: Mike Melis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Palmer
Represented By: Mike Melis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli, II
Represented By: Mike Melis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.