Patel v. Barot et al

Defendant: CAAP Hospitality, LLC, Prakash D. Barot, Harshad D. Barot, Shrinidhi Corporation, Inc. and DBSH, LLC
Plaintiff: Mukesh Patel
Case Number: 4:2013cv00059
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Office: Newport News Office
County: Williamsburg City
Referring Judge: Lawrence R. Leonard
Presiding Judge: Henry C. Morgan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 39 Motion for Approval of Settlement and Dismissal and Defendants' 42 Motion for Settlement Approval and GRANTING Plaintiff's counsel's 45 Motion to Withdraw. The Court ORDERS that all claims for damages included in the Complaint and specifically those claims for damages under the FLSA and for personal injury are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. With the exception of those costs specified as reimbursable to Plaintiff's counsel, all other costs shall be borne by the party incurring them. Entered and filed 4/23/14, as outlined. (See Order and Footnotes for specifics) (Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 4/23/14). (ecav, )
June 13, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER on Motions of James R. Theuer, PLLC 56 Motion to Intervene and 57 Motion for Order of Contempt and Entry of Judgment. Ruling from the bench, the Court GRANTED the Motion to Intervene and RESERVED RULING on the Motion for Order of Contempt and Entry of Judgment, as outlined. The Defendants were ORDERED to comply with the terms of the settlement agreement and this Court's April 23, 2014 Order by June 23, 2014. A hearing was SCHEDULED for June 23, 2014 at 12:00 p.m. fo r the purposes of determining the appropriate remedy and sanctions if Defendants' do not comply with the terms of this Court's Orders, as outlined. (See Order for Specifics) Copies provided as directed on 6/13/14 and copy mailed to Plaintiff Patel on 6/13/14 at address provided on above motions. Entered and filed 6/13/14. (Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 6/13/14_. (ecav)
June 23, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER on the Motion of Intervenor James R. Theuer, PLLC ("Theuer") for Order of Contempt and Entry of Judgment ("Motion"), Doc. 57. Ruling from the bench, the Court FOUND Defendants in intentional, bad-faith violation of the Court's April 23, 2014 and June 13, 2014 Order as outlined. The Defendants were ORDERED to amend the Deed of Trust (DOT), as outlined. Failure to comply with this ORDER will result in SANCTIONS of $100 per day until the amended DOT is executed. Defendants were further ORDERED to begin making payments to Patel in compliance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement approved in the Court's April 23 Order within fifteen (15) business days of this Order. Failure to comply with this ORDER will result in SANCTIONS of $100 per day until Defendants are in compliance with the payment schedule outlined in the Settlement Agreement. A hearing was SCHEDULED for July 14, 2014 @ 12:00 p.m. to assess Defendants' c ompliance and to determine if more sanctions are necessary, as outlined. (See Order for Specifics) Entered and filed 6/23/14. (Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 6/23/14). Copies provided as directed on 6/23/14. Copy mailed to Plaintiff Patel on 6/23/14. (ecav, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. Barot et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAAP Hospitality, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prakash D. Barot
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harshad D. Barot
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shrinidhi Corporation, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBSH, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mukesh Patel
Represented By: James Richard Theuer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]