Robinson v. Bartlow et al

Defendant: Joeybra LLC, Does 1-5, Inclusive, Mariah Gentry and Kyle Bartlow
Plaintiff: Charles Robinson
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00024
Filed: May 22, 2012
 
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Charlottesville Office
Presiding Judge: Norman K. Moon
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2012 28 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/3/2012. (mab)
October 3, 2012 29 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum 26 filed by Charles Robinson, DENYING MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (or Change Venue) 17 filed by Mariah Gentry, Kyle Bartlow, Does 1-5, Inclusive, Joeybra LLC, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge B. Waugh Crigler. Motions referred to B. Waugh Crigler.. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/3/2012. (mab)
March 22, 2013 49 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/22/13. (jcj)
May 8, 2013 58 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 5/8/2013. (mab)
May 8, 2013 59 Featured Case ORDER denying 51 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 5/8/2013. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Robinson v. Bartlow et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joeybra LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5, Inclusive
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariah Gentry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Bartlow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Robinson
Represented By: Dale Reese Jensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]