Luther v. Wells Fargo Bank

Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Plaintiff: James T. Luther
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv00057
Filed: December 7, 2011
 
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Danville Office
Presiding Judge: Michael F. Urbanski
 
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2012 13 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 2/8/12. (mka)
May 10, 2012 30 Featured Case OPINION/ORDER. Plaintiff has 15 days from date of Order to amend Complaint; Wells Fargo to file its response within 14 days of the filing of Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 5/10/2012. (mlh)
September 25, 2012 45 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 43 Report and Recommendations; GRANTING 32 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; DENYING AS MOOT 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; DENYING AS MOOT 23 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING A S MOOT 39 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; DENYING AS MOOT 40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Defendant's Discovery Requests. Case is dismissed with prejudice and stricken from active docket of the Court. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 9/25/2012. (mlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Luther v. Wells Fargo Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Terry Catherine Frank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T. Luther
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]