Foulke v. Virginia State Police et al

Defendant: Virginia State Police and Commonwealth of Virginia
Plaintiff: Cynthia L. Foulke
 
Case Number: 6:2012cv00006
Filed: January 27, 2012
 
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Lynchburg Office
Referring Judge: Robert S. Ballou
Presiding Judge: Norman K. Moon
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2012 18 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on March 13, 2012. (sfc)
September 24, 2012 50 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/24/2012. (kab)
September 24, 2012 51 Featured Case ORDER granting 34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 34 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; and this matter will be stricken from the court's active docket. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 09/24/2012. (kab)
March 21, 2013 56 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on March 21, 2013. (sfc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Foulke v. Virginia State Police et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia State Police
Represented By: Ryan Fitzgerald Furgurson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Ryan Fitzgerald Furgurson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia L. Foulke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]