McAirlaids, Inc. v. Kimberly-Clark Corporation et al

Case Number: 7:2013cv00193
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Samuel G. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER DENYING Kimberly-Clark's proposal to bifurcate discovery in this case. Signed by Judge Samuel G. Wilson on 08/05/2013. (ssm)
February 4, 2015 361 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 2/4/2015. (eot)
February 4, 2015 362 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 2/4/15. (eot)
December 31, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Samuel G. Wilson on 12/31/2013. (rkc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAirlaids, Inc. v. Kimberly-Clark Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.