Corson v. Secretary of Veterans Affairs

Plaintiff: David C. Corson
Defendant: Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 1:2009cv00049
Filed: April 9, 2009
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other Office
County: Calhoun
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER/OPINION granting 28 Motion to Amend Complaint. The Clerk is directed to file Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and attachments. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S Kaull on 11/6/2009. (Copy pro se plaintiff/certified mail)(kd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2009: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt same as #30) (kd).
January 13, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS/OPINION re 1 Complaint and 33 Amended Complaint, 21 MOTION to Seal, 26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Strike MOTION to Stay MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order all filed by David C. Corson, and 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Secretary of Veterans Affairs. RECOMMENDATION: The VA's Motion to Dismiss 17 beGRANTED. Corson's motions be DENIED AS MOOT. This matter be DISMISSED and stricken from the Courts docket. Objections to R&R due within 14 calendar days after being served with a copy of this R&R. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 1/12/2010. (Copy pro se plaintiff/certified mail)(kd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2010: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (kd).
February 8, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 36 Report and Recommendations ; denying as moot 21 Motion to Seal; denying as moot 26 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot 26 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 26 Motion to Stay; d enying as moot 26 Motion for TRO. Also the court ORDERS that Corson's case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and stricken from the Courts docket. The Clerk of Court is to enter a separate judgment order. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/8/2010. (Copy pro se petitioner/certified mail)(kd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2010: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (kd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corson v. Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Corson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]