MCCOY 6 APARTMENTS, LLC et al v. City Of Morgantown, WV et al

Plaintiff: MCCOY 6 APARTMENTS, LLC, Augusta Apartments, LLC, Kristian E. Warner, Benjamin F. Warner, Andrew M. Warner and Monroe P. Warner
Defendant: City Of Morgantown, WV, Daniel Boroff, David Fetty, Kenneth Tennant, Patrick Pickenpaugh, Jason Quinn, Terry Hough, Michael Stone, David Friend and Tye Poling
Case Number: 1:2010cv00054
Filed: April 5, 2010
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Clarksburg Office
Presiding Judge: Irene M. Keeley
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2013 166 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS ORDER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DKT. NO. 105 . DISMISSES the individual defendants WITH PREJUDICE; GRANTS the plaintiffs oral motion to dismiss the defendants Motion to Alter Judgment, Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens dkt.no. 109 ; ORDERS the case STRICKEN from the Courts docket. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/1/2013. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF)(jmm)
August 26, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order Granting-in-part and Denying-in-part Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 28 and 45 and Dismissing Augusta Apartments, LLC, as a Party. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/26/11. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00054-IMK, 1:10-cv-00055-IMK(mh) Modified on 8/26/2011 to correct typographical error. NEF regnerated (mh).
October 25, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION/ORDER; GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as to 66 Motion for Protective Order in case 1:10-cv-00054-IMK -JSK; GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as to 59 Motion for Protective Order in case 1:10-cv-00055-IMK -JSK. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 10/25/2011. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00054-IMK -JSK, 1:10-cv-00055-IMK -JSK(jmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCOY 6 APARTMENTS, LLC et al v. City Of Morgantown, WV et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCCOY 6 APARTMENTS, LLC
Represented By: James R. Cooney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augusta Apartments, LLC
Represented By: James R. Cooney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristian E. Warner
Represented By: James R. Cooney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin F. Warner
Represented By: James R. Cooney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew M. Warner
Represented By: James R. Cooney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monroe P. Warner
Represented By: James R. Cooney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Morgantown, WV
Represented By: David M. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Boroff
Represented By: David M. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fetty
Represented By: David M. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Tennant
Represented By: David M. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Pickenpaugh
Represented By: David M. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Quinn
Represented By: David M. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Hough
Represented By: David M. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stone
Represented By: David M. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Friend
Represented By: David M. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tye Poling
Represented By: David M. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]