Byard et al v. Verizon West Virginia, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lisa M Tharp, Lynet White, Charles R. Byard, David M Brosius, Kimberly A. Ray and Stephanie Snow-McKisic
Defendant: Verizon West Virginia, Inc., Frontier West Virginia, Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Verizon Communications, Inc., Jodi Dennis, Mary Frederick, Cody Stewart, Barbara Terwilliger, Bob Anderson, Tammy Mason, Dawn Watson, Michael Hathaway and Corby Miller
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00132
Filed: August 15, 2011
 
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Clarksburg Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Irene M. Keeley
 
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2012 185 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION [DKT. NO. 105]. GRANTS IN PART 105 the plaintiffs motion for conditional certification and implementation of court-facilitated notice plan. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/24/2012. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF)(jmm)
January 2, 2013 318 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DECIDING DOCKET ENTRY 143. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 143 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Clerk is hereby directed to remove DE 143 from the docket of motions actively pending before the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 1/2/2013. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF)(jmm)
October 7, 2013 451 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DECIDING DOCKET ENTRY 380 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 10/7/2013.(Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF) (jmm)
October 11, 2013 452 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DECIDING DOCKET ENTRY 356; Plaintiffs Motion For Protective Order DE 356 is GRANTED. Defendants discovery DE 339 , DE 340 , DE 341 are stricken. Case Management Conference Hearing set for 10/21/2013 12:00 PM in Clarksburg Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 10/11/2013. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF)(jmm)
October 15, 2013 453 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DECIDING DOCKET ENTRY 443 . For the reasons stated herein Plaintiffs' Motion For Protective Order 443 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 10/15/2013. (kd)
March 30, 2012 49 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER; DENIES as to 26 Plaintiffs Motion to Remand; GRANTS as to 9 Verizon Communications, Inc Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; DISMISSES Counts One and Two of the plaintiffs complaint (dkt. no. 1-1 at 32) WITH P REJUDICE. GRANTS the remaining defendants motions to dismiss for failure to state a claim dkt. nos. 11 , 12 , 13 , 17 . GRANTS-IN-PART as to 46 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File an amended complaint to the extent that the plaintiffs seek leav e to assert a claim arising under theFair Labor Standards Act, 29 U.S.C. § 201 et seq.; DENIES as MOOT as to 47 Defendants consent motion for an extension of time to respond. DIRECTS the plaintiffs to file an amended complaint consistent with these rulings within 30 days from the entry of this Order. Court directs Clerk to DISMISS the defendant Verizon Communications, Inc. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 3/30/2012. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF)(jmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Byard et al v. Verizon West Virginia, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa M Tharp
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Larry J. Rector
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynet White
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Larry J. Rector
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles R. Byard
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Larry J. Rector
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M Brosius
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Larry J. Rector
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly A. Ray
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Larry J. Rector
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Snow-McKisic
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Larry J. Rector
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon West Virginia, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier West Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore A. Schroeder
Represented By: Erica L. Clarke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Services Corp.
Represented By: Stanley Weiner
Represented By: Michael M. Michetti
Represented By: Parween S. Mascari
Represented By: Roger A. Wolfe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Parween S. Mascari
Represented By: Michael M. Michetti
Represented By: Stanley Weiner
Represented By: Roger A. Wolfe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Dennis
Represented By: Erica L. Clarke
Represented By: Theodore A. Schroeder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Frederick
Represented By: Parween S. Mascari
Represented By: Michael M. Michetti
Represented By: Stanley Weiner
Represented By: Roger A. Wolfe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Stewart
Represented By: Parween S. Mascari
Represented By: Michael M. Michetti
Represented By: Stanley Weiner
Represented By: Roger A. Wolfe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Terwilliger
Represented By: Parween S. Mascari
Represented By: Michael M. Michetti
Represented By: Stanley Weiner
Represented By: Roger A. Wolfe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Anderson
Represented By: Erica L. Clarke
Represented By: Theodore A. Schroeder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Mason
Represented By: Parween S. Mascari
Represented By: Michael M. Michetti
Represented By: Stanley Weiner
Represented By: Roger A. Wolfe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Watson
Represented By: Parween S. Mascari
Represented By: Michael M. Michetti
Represented By: Stanley Weiner
Represented By: Roger A. Wolfe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hathaway
Represented By: Erica L. Clarke
Represented By: Theodore A. Schroeder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corby Miller
Represented By: G. Thomas Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]