Zigmont v. Jones

Plaintiff: James S. Zigmont
Defendant: Angela Jones
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00134
Filed: August 18, 2011
 
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Clarksburg Office
County: Harrison
Referring Judge: John S. Kaull
Presiding Judge: Irene M. Keeley
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION, REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND recommending that re 7 Plaintiff's Forthwith Motion For Remand And Motion For Sanctions Request For Emergency Hearing,be DENIED. Within 14 days after being serv ed with a copy of this Memorandum Opinion,Report and Recommendation, any party may file with the Clerk of Court written objections identifying those portions of the recommendation to which objection is made and the basis for such objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 9/8/2011. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF, Pro Se Plaintiff via certified mail)(jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2011: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
September 27, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by James S. Zigmont. 12 Motion for Sanctions, Motion for Hearing filed by James S. Zigmont, 15 Memorandum & Opinion, Report and Recommendations. Court ADOPTS t he Report and Recommendation in its entirety and DENIES the plaintiffs motions to remand, for sanctions, and for an emergency hearing. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/27/2011. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF, pro se plaintiff via certified mail)(jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2011: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
November 22, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING SECOND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; ADOPTS the second R&R in its entirety as to 25 Report and Recommendations; GRANTS as to 19 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERS that this case be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and stricken from docket. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/22/2011. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF, pro se petitioner via certified mail)(jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2011: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Zigmont v. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James S. Zigmont
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Jones
Represented By: Alan G. McGonigal
Represented By: Katherine M Walker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]