Dickens v. Werner Enterprises, Inc.

Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald Dickens
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00076
Filed: May 8, 2012
 
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Clarksburg Office
County: Harrison
Referring Judge: John S. Kaull
Presiding Judge: Irene M. Keeley
 
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE MATTERS IN PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THAT ARE OUTSIDE OF THE PLEADINGS OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO CONVERT DEFENDANT 'S MOTION TO DISMISS INTO A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED that Defendant's 13 Motion to Strike Matters Outside the Pleadings is granted and Defendant's Motion to Convert the Motion to Dismiss into a Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 7/26/12. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(copy Plaintiff)(cnd)
July 26, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION/REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Werner Enterprises, Inc.: The Magistrate recommends that Defendant's 8 Motion to Dismiss be denied. Written objections may be filed within 14 days after being served. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 7/26/12. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(copy Plaintiff)(cnd) Modified document type on 7/26/2012 (cnd).
October 10, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT: It is ORDERED that Defendant's 8 Motion to Dismiss is denied; Magistrate Kaull's 15 Report and Recommendation is adopted in part; and grants Plaintiff's leave to file a more definite statement within 14 days of receipt of this Order. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/10/12. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(copy Plaintiff)(cnd)
March 4, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AND DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE: It is ORD ERED that Defendant's 60 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted; Plaintiff's 62 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied; Plaintiff's 65 Motion for Extension of Time to File is denied as moot; and this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 3/4/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(copy Plaintiff)(cnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dickens v. Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron M. Ponzo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Dickens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]