Van Wagner, III v. Crites et al

Defendant: Steven Crites, Joseph Walker, Christine Riley, Ronald E. Wilson, WV Judicial Investigating Commission and Harry Snow
Plaintiff: George H. Van Wagner, III
Case Number: 3:2012cv00016
Filed: February 29, 2012
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Martinsburg Office
County: Berkeley
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: David J. Joel
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 EMERGENCY PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/7/12. Copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail.(njz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2012: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
July 19, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 35 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Corporal Joseph Walker and DISMISSES without prejudice Joseph Walker from the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/19/12. (njz) Modified on 7/19/2012 (njz). Copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't. (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2012: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
July 19, 2012 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 80 Motion to Dismiss; granting 23 Motion to Dismiss and DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/19/12. copy mailed to pro se pla via return rec't mail.(njz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2012: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
August 8, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION 93 FOR RECONSIDERATION re 86 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 90 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 91 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 85 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 84 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by George H. Van Wagner, III. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/8/2012. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2012: # 1 certified mail receipt) (tlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Wagner, III v. Crites et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Crites
Represented By: Floyd M Sayre, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Walker
Represented By: Gary E. Pullin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Riley
Represented By: Christopher C. Luttrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald E. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WV Judicial Investigating Commission
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Snow
Represented By: Stephanie J. Shepherd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George H. Van Wagner, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]