Gregory v. Phelps et al

Defendant: Craig Phelps, Shanna Spiker and Their one unknown Police Officer JOHN DOE #1
Plaintiff: Lonnie Gregory
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00121
Filed: October 9, 2012
 
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Martinsburg Office
County: Berkeley
Presiding Judge: Gina M. Groh
Referring Judge: David J. Joel
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION 10 TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF FEES as to Lonnie Gregory. The Plaintiff has 28 days of the entry of this Order to pay the initial filing fee of $4.80. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Joel on 3/21 /2013. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff, copy emailed to financial deputy E. Howell, copy of order and executed consent mailed to ERJ trustee officer.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2013: # 1 certified mail receipt) (tlg).
August 22, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION 29 TO DISMISS Plaintiff's Complaint in Lieu of Answer by Craig Phelps, Shanna Spiker; denying Plaintiff's 31 Motion to order the Berkeley County Circuit Court to produce Plaintiff's records. P laintiff's second response 35 is termed as Court does not construe it as a motion. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 8/22/2013. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2013: # 1 certified mail receipt) (tlg).
October 24, 2013 53 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION 45 TO STRIKE 43 Response to Defendants' Answer filed by Craig Phelps, Shanna Spiker. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's response be stricken from the record. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 10/24/2013. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2013: # 1 certified mail receipt) (tlg).
March 4, 2014 75 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION 72 TO SUBPOENA PHOTOS AND VIDEOS. Said material shall be provided to Plaintiff at the 3/19/2014 deposition. Objections may be made to this Order within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 3/4/2014. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2014: # 1 certified mail receipt) (tlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gregory v. Phelps et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Phelps
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanna Spiker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Their one unknown Police Officer JOHN DOE #1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Gregory
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]