Kowalyk v. Hancock County et al

Plaintiff: Vanessa Kowalyk
Defendant: Hancock County, Hancock County Office Of The Sheriff, Mike White and Mark Alan Smith
Case Number: 5:2008cv00181
Filed: December 9, 2008
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Assault Libel & Slander Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Frederick P. Stamp
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: Granting 78 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 86 Motion in Limine No. 1; Granting 87 Motion in Limine No. 2; Granting 88 Motion in Limine No. 3; Granting 89 Motion in Limine No. 4; Granting 90 Motion in L imine No. 5; Denying as moot 91 Motion in Limine No. 6; Denying as moot 92 Motion in Limine No. 7; Dismissing and Striking civil action from active docket of this Court; and Directing Clerk to Enter Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 58. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 1/6/11. (soa)
April 9, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: Granting 10 Motion to Dismiss; Pltff's complaint as to Hancock County and Hancock County Office of the Sheriff is dismissed without prejudice to filing an amended complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P Stamp, Jr on 4/9/2009. (soa)
November 8, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: Denying 69 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's First Supplemental Disclosure of Experts and Expert Witnesses filed by Mike White, County Commission of Hancock County of Hancock County. Pltff to provide to defs. by 11/22/10, written reports from both Drs. Bernstein and McCauley; Pltff. to produce by 12/6/10 both Drs. Bernstein and McCauley at defs' attorney's office at Pltff's expense. Written Objections due by 11/22/2010. (copies to counsel, Judge) Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 11/8/10. (soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kowalyk v. Hancock County et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Kowalyk
Represented By: Thomas D Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hancock County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hancock County Office Of The Sheriff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Alan Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]