King v. Cardinal Health 411, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Nicole King
Defendant: Cardinal Health 411, Inc. and Tess Gray
 
Case Number: 5:2010cv00112
Filed: November 2, 2010
 
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Wheeling Office
County: Marshall
Presiding Judge: Frederick P. Stamp
 
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Denying 14 Motion to Remand. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 1/6/11. (mji)
September 7, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPIONION AND ORDER Granting Pla's 21 Motion To Allow The Filing Of A Second Amended Complaint And Denying Motion For Remand. Pla's is DIRECTED to file a signed copy of the second amended complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 9/7/11. (mji)
November 29, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Granting Pla's Second 47 Motion to Amend, LIFTING THE STAY of Discovery And Scheduling Status And Scheduling Conference set for 12/27/2011 11:00 AM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr.. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 11/29/11. (mji)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: King v. Cardinal Health 411, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole King
Represented By: Frank X. Duff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 411, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley K. Shafer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tess Gray
Represented By: Bradley K. Shafer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]