Givens v. Smith et al

Defendant: James P. Mazzone, Arthur M. Recht, Ronald E. Wilson, D. Luke Furbee, S. A. Zimmerman, Scott R. Smith, Keith C. Gamble, Stephen M. Fowler, Kenneth W. Blake, J. E. Dean and J. C. Weaver
Plaintiff: Dennis A. Givens
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00145
Filed: September 28, 2012
 
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Wheeling Office
County: Ohio
Referring Judge: James E. Seibert
Presiding Judge: Frederick P. Stamp
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2013 103 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND IMPOSING FILING RESTRICTIONS: granting 26 Motion to Dismiss; granting 29 Motion to Impose Filing Restrictions; granting 31 Motion for the Imposition of Filing Restrictions; affirming and adopting Report and Recommendations 71 and 96 ; denying 8 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 9 Motion to Disqualify Judge; denying as moot 99 Motion for documentation of defendant "c osts"; granting 18 Motion to Dismiss; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss; 22 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART as to defendants J.E. Dean and S.A. Zimmerman, and DENIED IN PART as to defendant J.C. Weaver.; granting 24 Motion to Dismis s; Accordingly, the plaintiff is hereby ENJOINED from filing any further civil actions in this Court which are related to any partys involvement in his prior lawsuits WITHOUT OBTAINING LEAVE OF COURT. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 7/1/13. (copy to counsel of record via CM/ECF and to pro se plaintiff by certified mail, rr)(rjs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2013: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (rjs).
April 9, 2014 167 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND, AND AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING FINAL ORDERS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO RETAIN EXPERTS, AND GRANTI NG PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION; denying 145 Motion to Amend/Correct; 158 adopting Report and Recommendations in its entirety; Accordingly, the plaintiff's motion to amend his complaint is DENIED and the plaintiff's objection s thereto are OVERRULED. Further, the magistrate judges final orders as to the other motions are AFFIRMED and ADOPTED in their entirety. As such, the plaintiff's motion to compel deposition is GRANTED; the plaintiff's motion to retain experts is DENIED; and the plaintiff's objections thereto are hereby OVERRULED. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 4/9/14. (copy to counsel of record via CM/ECF and to pro se plaintiff via certified mail, rrr) (rjs)
August 27, 2014 202 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING AND AFFIRMING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE, GRANTING DEFENDANT OFFICER J.C. WEAVER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER ON OTHER MOTIONS: granting 172 Motio n for Summary Judgment; adopting 193 Report and Recommendations; the plaintiff's motions for judicial notice 177 , 184 , and 185 are DENIED; the plaintiff's motion for recusal 178 is DENIED; and the plaintiff's motion for exte nsion of time to file a response/reply 183 is DENIED. This Civil Action is dismissed. Clerk directed to enter judgment on this matter Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 8/27/14. (copy to counsel of record via CM/ECF and to the pro se plaintiff via certified mail, rrr)(rjs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2014: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (rjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Givens v. Smith et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Mazzone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur M. Recht
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald E. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Luke Furbee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. A. Zimmerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott R. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith C. Gamble
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen M. Fowler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth W. Blake
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. E. Dean
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Weaver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis A. Givens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]