RG Steel Wheeling, LLC v. The Health Plan of the Upper Ohio Valley Inc.

Defendant: The Health Plan of the Upper Ohio Valley Inc.
Plaintiff: RG Steel Wheeling, LLC
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00007
Filed: January 18, 2013
 
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Wheeling Office
County: Ohio
Presiding Judge: Frederick P. Stamp
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2013 31 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER CONFIRMING PRONOUNCED ORDER OF THE COURT DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART 6 DEFENDANT'S FIRST MOTION TO DISMISS. The defendant's first motion to dismiss is DENIED except that this motion is GRANTED as to the claim for prejudgment interest on the fiduciary duty and negligence claims. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/12/2013 (received in Clerk's office on 9/13/2013). (copy to counsel of record via CM/ECF) (nmm)
October 3, 2013 37 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 13 DEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 10/3/13. (cc)
August 5, 2014 83 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PARTTHIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT VEBAS 72 MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT;GRANTING VEBAS MOTION, IN THE ALTERNATIVE,AS TO COUNT I, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; AND SCHEDULING STATU S AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Health Plan is DIRECTED to file a more definite statement as to Count I by 8/19/2014. Status and Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2014 03:15 PM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 8/5/14. (cc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: RG Steel Wheeling, LLC v. The Health Plan of the Upper Ohio Valley Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Health Plan of the Upper Ohio Valley Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RG Steel Wheeling, LLC
Represented By: Richard N. Beaver
Represented By: Charles J. Kaiser, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]