Friedman v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al

Defendant: Eric Holder, Federal Bureau of Prisons, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Charles E. Samuels, Jr. and John Doe
Plaintiff: Charles D. Friedman
Case Number: 5:2013cv00062
Filed: May 9, 2013
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Wheeling Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: John S. Kaull
Presiding Judge: Frederick P. Stamp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING 53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction 19 is DENIED and plaintiff's request for submissi on of his motion for review 32 is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 3/3/2014. (copy to Pro Se Petitioner via Certified Mail, rrr; copy to counsel of record via CM/ECF) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2014: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
September 5, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING 68 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. All pending motions are hereby DENIED AS MOOT. It is ORDERED that this civil action be DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the active docket of this Cou rt. Because the petitioner failed to object, he waives his right to seek appellate review of this matter. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/5/2014. (copy to counsel of record via CM/ECF; copy to Pro Se Petitioner via Cert. Mail, rrr) (nmm)
September 23, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING THE 68 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE, OVERRULING 76 PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS, DENYING 71 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY STAY AND VACATING 75 PRIOR OPINION AND ORDER. This civil action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this case be DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the active docket of this Court. Should the plaintiff choose to appeal the judgment, he is ADVISED that he must file a notice of appea l within 60 days after the date of entry of judgment. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/23/2014. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via Cert. Mail, rrr; copy to counsel of record via CM/ECF) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2014: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friedman v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Samuels, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles D. Friedman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]