Goldman et al v. Phillips & Sons Drilling, Inc. et al

Defendant: Phillips & Sons Drilling, Inc. and Mid Maryland Excavating, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adam Goldman and David Goldman
Counter_claimant: Mid Maryland Excavating, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Mid Maryland Excavating, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00152
Filed: October 25, 2013
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Martinsburg Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Gina M. Groh
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION 109 AND MEMORANDUM TO STRIKE JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT DISCLOSURE filed by Adam Goldman, David Goldman. Objections can be filed within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 7/9/2014. (tlg)
March 10, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING SECOND MOTION 38 TO EXTEND MOTION TO COMPEL FILING DEADLINE. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 3/10/2014. (tlg)
June 9, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING JOINT MOTION 96 IN SUPPORT OF MEDIATION. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 6/9/2014. (tlg)
June 9, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT MID MARYLAND EXCAVATING, INC.'S MOTION 74 AND SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION 79 TO COMPEL EXPERT DISCLOSURES AND RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES. Objections are due within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 6/9/2014. (tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldman et al v. Phillips & Sons Drilling, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips & Sons Drilling, Inc.
Represented By: Tonya P. Shuler
Represented By: W. Michael Moore
Represented By: Eric J. Hulett
Represented By: Marey Casey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid Maryland Excavating, Inc.
Represented By: W. Michael Moore
Represented By: Eric J. Hulett
Represented By: Marey Casey
Represented By: Tonya P. Shuler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Goldman
Represented By: Christopher P. Stroech
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Goldman
Represented By: Christopher P. Stroech
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Mid Maryland Excavating, Inc.
Represented By: Marey Casey
Represented By: Eric J. Hulett
Represented By: W. Michael Moore
Represented By: Tonya P. Shuler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Mid Maryland Excavating, Inc.
Represented By: Marey Casey
Represented By: Eric J. Hulett
Represented By: W. Michael Moore
Represented By: Tonya P. Shuler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]