Everett et al v. Paul Davis Restoration Inc et al

Plaintiff: Renee Everett and Building Werks of WI LLC
Defendant: Paul Davis Restoration Inc, EA Green Bay LLC and Matthew L Everett
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00634
Filed: July 26, 2010
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Green Bay Office
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2011 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING the ruling of April 4, 2011 on 95 Rule 7(h) MOTION for Protective Order and 94 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum and GRANTING 95 Rule 7(h) MOTION for Protective Order and 94 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum, signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 04/06/2011. The Court is satisfied that the requisite showing of relevance has not been made. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAIL. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
September 18, 2012 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 145 Motion for Judgment Confirming Arbitration Award; GRANTING 149 Motion to Vacate the Award; DENYING the request contained in 172 to Strike reply brief for exceeding the page limit; and GRANTING 175 Motion to Supplement, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 09/18/2012. See Order for full detail. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
December 11, 2012 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/10/2012 denying 188 Motion for Reconsideration. (cc: all counsel,USCA via e-mail) (Griesbach, William)
August 26, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING 16 7(h) MOTION for Discovery and Extension of Time with the understanding that the parties will consult with one another in an attempt to work out any disagreement as to the scope of the expedited discovery to which PDR I is entitled, signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 08/26/2010. Responses to PDRIs request for production of documents due on or before September 10, 2010; depositions requested by PDRI to be completed on or before October 1, 2010. PDRIs response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction due on or before October 15, 2010; Plaintiffs reply shall be filed on or before October 26, 2010. This matter is scheduled for an evidentiary hearing on October 29, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. Motion for a TRO is denied as moot. See Order for express conditions and full detail. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
November 5, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Motion to Remand signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 11/05/2010. The plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees is also DENIED as moot. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
February 15, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Motion for Protective Order; signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 2/15/2011. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Everett et al v. Paul Davis Restoration Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Everett
Represented By: John F Hovel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Building Werks of WI LLC
Represented By: John F Hovel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Davis Restoration Inc
Represented By: Daniel M Janssen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EA Green Bay LLC
Represented By: Jeremy P Levison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew L Everett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]