Cherry et al v. Washington County Sheriff's Department et al

Defendant: Thomas Abbott, Ronald Rewerts, Mike Jankowski, Bruce Theusch, Michael Anderson, James Wolf, Washington County Sheriff's Department, Dale K Schmidt, Buck Jeremy Robertson, Randy Boudry and Mike Cummings
Plaintiff: Eugene L Cherry and Valerie Dabel
Case Number: 1:2011cv01021
Filed: November 4, 2011
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Green Bay Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 37 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 20 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's should submit an amended complaint within 21 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 01/30/2012. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Eugene Cherry and Valerie Dabel) (Griesbach, William)
April 3, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court SCREENING ORDER - signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 04/02/2012. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Eugene Cherry and Valerie Dabel)(Griesbach, William)
June 29, 2012 92 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER denying 53 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 57 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 61 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 76 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Willi am C Griesbach on 06/29/2012. Defendants motions for summary judgment on all claims are granted. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of the defendants and against the plaintiffs. SEE DECISION FOR FULL DETAIL. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
July 11, 2012 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Motion for Reconsideration; signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 07/11/2012. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Eugene Cherry and Valerie Dabel) (Griesbach, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherry et al v. Washington County Sheriff's Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Abbott
Represented By: Martin J De Vries
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Rewerts
Represented By: Martin J De Vries
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Jankowski
Represented By: John J Glinski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Theusch
Represented By: Martin J De Vries
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Anderson
Represented By: Martin J De Vries
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wolf
Represented By: Martin J De Vries
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Martin J De Vries
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale K Schmidt
Represented By: Martin J De Vries
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buck Jeremy Robertson
Represented By: Martin J De Vries
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Boudry
Represented By: Martin J De Vries
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Cummings
Represented By: Martin J De Vries
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene L Cherry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Dabel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]