Schwerdtfeger et al v. Petrie et al

Appellant: Chadwick Paul Schwerdtfeger and Paula Schwerdtfeger
Appellee: Allen L Petrie and Gayle M Petrie
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00085
Filed: January 23, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Green Bay Office
County: Waupaca
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 4/17/2013. Appellants were warned that their failure to comply with the rules within the time allowed could result in dismissal of their appeal. They have offered no reason for their failure to comply. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 27, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 03/27/2013. The appellants shall comply with Rule 8006 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and must file with the clerk and serve on the appellee a designation of the items to be included in the record on appeal and a statement of the issues to be presented within 10 days of the date of this order. In addition, because the brief filed by the appellants contains no citations to the record, the Clerk is ordered to STRIKE the appellants brief (ECF No. 3) and the response filed by the appellees (ECF No. 5). In accordance with Rule 8009, the Court hereby VACATES the existing briefing schedule and specifies the timing for refiling the briefs as follows: (1) the appellants brief shal l be served and filed within 14 days of the receipt of the transmission of the record by the clerk of the district court; (2) the appellees brief shall be served and filed within 14 days after service of the brief of the appellant; and (3) the appell ant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the brief of the appellee. The Clerk is further ordered to remove from the calendar the telephone status conference currently scheduled for April 2, 2013. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAIL. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 29, 2013 9 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER re 6 Order to correct erroneous statement, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 03/29/2013. See Order for full detail. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Schwerdtfeger et al v. Petrie et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Chadwick Paul Schwerdtfeger
Represented By: Jeffrey L Hahn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Paula Schwerdtfeger
Represented By: Jeffrey L Hahn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Allen L Petrie
Represented By: Michael E Grubb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gayle M Petrie
Represented By: Michael E Grubb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]