Texas Ujoints LLC v. Machine Service Inc et al

Plaintiff: Texas Ujoints LLC
Defendant: Dana Holding Corporation and Machine Service Inc
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01008
Filed: September 6, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Green Bay Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Remand, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/02/2013. Defendant Machine Services, Inc. is dismissed from this action. Texas Ujoints motion for costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees is also DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to set this matter on the Courts calendar for a telephonic scheduling conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
September 9, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADDRESSING 46 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Antitrust Claims (filed by Dana Limited and Dana Holding Corporation), 49 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal or, in the alternative, construe as a Motion to Amend Complaint (see ECF 54 Brief in Opposition), and 50 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Antitrust Claims filed by Dana Limited and Dana Holding Corporation, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 09/09/2014. THEREFORE, Texas Ujoints Notice of Voluntary Dismissal 49 is construed as a motion for leave to file an amended complaint dropping its antitrust claim. As so construed, the motion is GRANTED CONDITIONED UPON Texas Ujoints paying Dana the costs and attorneys fees incurred seekin g dismissal of the antitrust claim. IF TEXAS UJOINTS ELECTS NOT TO PAY SUCH AMOUNT, its motion for leave to amend 46 is DENIED, Dana's Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss 46 will be GRANTED and the antitrust claim DISMISSED with prejudice. Texas Ujoints has ten days to advise the court of its decision. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
September 19, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 46 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Antitrust Claims filed by Dana Limited and Dana Holding Corporation, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 09/19/2014. For the reasons set forth in the September 9, 2014 Order on Defend ants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Antitrust Claims and based upon the Notice, ECF 59 , filed by the plaintiff on September 18, 2014, the Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and Plaintiffs antitrust claims are dismissed on their merits and with prejudice. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Texas Ujoints LLC v. Machine Service Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Ujoints LLC
Represented By: Kurt A Goehre
Represented By: David H Weber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Holding Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan T Smies
Represented By: Sean O Bosack
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Machine Service Inc
Represented By: Allen C Schlinsog, Jr
Represented By: Colleen E Fielkow
Represented By: Thomas M Burnett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]