Tilot Oil LLC v. BP Products North America Inc

Plaintiff: Tilot Oil LLC
Defendant: BP Products North America Inc
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv00210
Filed: February 26, 2009
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Torts to Land Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:6901 Resource & Recovery Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2012 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 1/17/12: denying 120 defendant's Motion to Strike; denying 125 defendant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum, Proposed Facts, and Affidavit; denying 67 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and, granting in part and denying in part 75 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment - summary judgment is granted to the defendant as to the plaintiff's first claim, for violation of the Resource Conservation and Recovery Act. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (nm)
August 12, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the stipulated protective order (Docket No. 33) is STRICKEN without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Rudolph T Randa on 08/12/2009. (cc: all counsel)(Koll, J)
August 3, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 8/3/11 granting 53 defendant's Motion to Compel; plaintiff shall execute [56-7] the authorization attached to the affidavit of Kathryn R. Downey as Exhibit G. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (nm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tilot Oil LLC v. BP Products North America Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tilot Oil LLC
Represented By: Pamela H Schaefer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]