United States of America v. Approximately $7400 US Currency et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $7400 US Currency and Approximately $5602.20 US Currency
Case Number: 2:2009cv00950
Filed: October 2, 2009
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 MOTION to compel Murillo to respond to requests for production numbers six and seven and for modification of the dates set by the scheduling order. Murillo must supplement her responses to requests for production numbers six and s even no later than 06/22/2011; Discovery due by 8/30/2011, Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2011. The final pretrial conference call set for 09/23/2011, at 2:00 p.m., and the court trial set for 10/6/2011, at 9:00 a.m. are CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Rudolph T Randa on 05/31/2011. (cc: all counsel)(Koll, J)
September 15, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T Randa on 09/15/2011 granting 29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ronald Gabriel Benavides terminated; granting 30 Motion to Stay. No later than 10/05/2011, Murillo MUST, either by new counsel or by herself, respond fully and completely to the United States' requests for production numbers six and seven and file a response to the United States motion to strike and for default. (cc: all counsel; via US Mail to Claudia Murillo-Figueroa) (Koll, J)
October 13, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T Randa on 10/13/2011 granting 27 Motion to Strike and for default judgment. The defendant properties, approximately $7,400.00 in United States currency and approximately $5,602.20 in United States currency i n U.S. Bank savings account ending in number 9352, ARE FORFEITED to the United States of America for disposition according to law; The Government is awarded the costs and disbursements of this action; This action is DISMISSED. (cc: all counsel) (Koll, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $7400 US Currency et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Scott J Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $7400 US Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $5602.20 US Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]