Stayart v. Google Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff: Beverly Stayart
Defendant: Google Inc
Case Number: 2:2010cv00336
Filed: April 20, 2010
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Walworth
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2010 8 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/12/10 granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time. Google's answer due 6/3/10. (cc: all counsel)
May 11, 2010 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)
May 11, 2010 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James D Peterson on behalf of Google Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: James D. Peterson and Jennifer L. Gregor (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)
May 10, 2010 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)
April 26, 2010 4 Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by All Plaintiffs.
April 26, 2010 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants.
April 20, 2010 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Beverly Stayart. (cms)
April 20, 2010 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Google Inc filed by Beverly Stayart. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge Patricia Gorence. jury demand; (Filing Fee PAID $350; 4689017666) (Attachments: # 1 complaint part 2, # 2 complaint part 3, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cms) Modified on 4/27/2010 (cms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stayart v. Google Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Stayart
Represented By: Gregory A Stayart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.