James Michael Leasing Company LLC v. PACCAR Inc

Plaintiff: James Michael Leasing Company LLC
Defendant: PACCAR Inc
Case Number: 2:2011cv00747
Filed: August 8, 2011
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Walworth
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2015 104 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/12/15 granting 92 Motion for Attorney Fees. The plaintiff shall recover an additional $905.91 in costs and $60,724.50 in attorneys fees from the defendant. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
October 16, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/16/12 regarding jurisdiction and setting status conference for 10/31/12 at 11:00 AM in Room 390, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, Wisconsin. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
November 19, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/19/12 granting in part 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. The precise amount of James Michael Leasings damage award remains to be determined; denying 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Further ordering status conference for 12/4/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 321, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Judge Lynn Adelman. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
February 26, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/26/13 denying 42 MOTION for Reconsideration. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
March 13, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/13/13 that plaintiff's brief regarding post-summary judgment issues due 5/15/13; defendant's response due 6/17/13; plaintiff's reply brief due 7/1/13. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
October 24, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/24/13 granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion for judgment, Motion for attorney fees; denying 77 Motion to Expedite. Finally ordering defendant to respond to plaintiffs request forattorneys fees for work performed after 5/15/2013, within 21 days of the date of this order. (cc: all counsel) (dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Michael Leasing Company LLC v. PACCAR Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Michael Leasing Company LLC
Represented By: Timothy J Aiken
Represented By: Susan M Grzeskowiak
Represented By: Vincent P Megna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey S Fertl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.