Meade Electric Co Inc v. Milwaukee Metropolitan Sewerage District

Defendant: Milwaukee Metropolitan Sewerage District
Plaintiff: Meade Electric Co Inc
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01014
Filed: October 4, 2012
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 8/20/2013 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 19 Motion to Compel. See Order for details. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
October 16, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 10/16/2013 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. Within 10 days of the date of this Order, parties to jointly advise the Court regarding plans for compliance with "Article 58 (REMEDIES)" as it pertains to non-binding mediation. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
March 3, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 3/3/2014 DENYING 47 Motion in Limine to Exclude Introduction of Certain Evidence. (cc: all counsel) (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Meade Electric Co Inc v. Milwaukee Metropolitan Sewerage District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Metropolitan Sewerage District
Represented By: Susan B Anthony
Represented By: Katherine E Lazarski
Represented By: James H Petersen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meade Electric Co Inc
Represented By: Joshua B Levy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]