Ullico Casualty Company et al v. Matthiesen Wickert and Lehrer SC

Plaintiff: Ullico Casualty Company and Patriot National Insurance Group Inc
Defendant: Matthiesen Wickert and Lehrer SC
Case Number: 2:2012cv01031
Filed: October 9, 2012
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/23/13 denying without prejudice 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; 15 Motion to Dismiss; 16 Motion to Stay. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
March 27, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/27/13 granting 38 Motion to Stay. However, if the Southern District of Texas remands its case to the Brazoria County court, I will consider whether I should lift the stay. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
June 24, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/24/2013 16 MOTION to Stay (Motion for Abstention). (cc: all counsel)(nts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ullico Casualty Company et al v. Matthiesen Wickert and Lehrer SC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ullico Casualty Company
Represented By: Daniel J Kennedy
Represented By: John J Curry
Represented By: Michael B Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patriot National Insurance Group Inc
Represented By: Michael B Brennan
Represented By: John J Curry
Represented By: Daniel J Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthiesen Wickert and Lehrer SC
Represented By: Charles H Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.