Staffa v. Pollard et al

Defendant: James Greer, William Pollard, David Burnett, P Sumnicht and Belinda Schrubbe
Plaintiff: Mark P Staffa
Case Number: 2:2013cv00005
Filed: January 2, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2014 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 7/28/2014. 106 Plaintiff's MOTION for jury DENIED; 113 Plaintiff's MOTION for temporary restraining order/injunction DENIED; 115 Defendants' MOTION to quash subpoena GRANTED; 116 Plaintiff's MOTION for copy of subpoenaed evidence/oral argument of evidence DENIED. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Mark Staffa at Waupun Correctional Institution)(cb)
September 11, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 9/11/2014. 119 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Counsel DENIED without prejudice; Plaintiff's request for leave to appeal GRANTED as to appeal of Court's 7/28/2014 Order denying request for inju nctive relief and DENIED as to appeal of Court's 7/28/2014 Order denying discovery-related motions and motion to convene jury; 129 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis GRANTED. Plaintiff not required to pay initial par tial filing fee. Wis. Dept. of Corrections to collect $505 balance of appeal fee from plaintiff's prison trust account pursuant to 28 USC § 1915(b)(2). Proceedings stayed until such time as Court of Appeals has resolved plaintiff's appeal from Court's denial of injunctive relief. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Warden and Mark Staffa at Waupun Correctional Institution, PLRA Attorney at 7th Circuit)(cb)
May 31, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 5/31/2013 DENYING 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order/Permanent Injunction; DENYING 16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order/Permanent Injunction. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Mark Staffa at Waupun Correctional Institution)(cb)
January 3, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 1/3/2014. STAY LIFTED: Discovery due 3/28/2014; Dispositive Motions due 4/30/2014. 50 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction DENIED. 54 REQUEST for Qualified Protective Order/Compel Discovery DENIED. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Mark Staffa at Waupun Correctional Institution)(cb)
April 9, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 4/9/2013 GRANTING 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Copies of this Order and plaintiff's complaint to be electronically sent to Wis. Dept. of Justice; Defendants to file responsive plead ing within 60 days of receipt of this Order; Dept. of Corrections shall collect $346.42 balance of filing fee in monthly payments from plaintiff's prison trust account. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Mark Staffa and Warden at Waupun Correctional Institution) (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staffa v. Pollard et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Greer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pollard
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Burnett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Sumnicht
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Schrubbe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark P Staffa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]